Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mindy A Mora
Case #: 9:24-bk-13583
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Claims Deadline:Jun 24, 2024
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Plan Confirmed:Sep 12, 2024

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Evergreen Homes Of Florida, Inc.
9862 Palma Vista Way
Boca Raton, FL 33428-3500
Represented By
Philip J Landau
Landau Law, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Sunday, January 26, 2025
121 121 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/27 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 119 Final Decree. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Friday, January 24, 2025
120 120 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 01/24 2:26 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]
119 119 order Final Decree [Order] [Chapter 11] Fri 01/24 2:25 PM
Final Decree. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
118 118 trustee UST Notice of No Objection to Entry of Final Decree (Ch 11) [PAPERLESS] Wed 01/22 12:58 PM
The debtor in the above case has filed a Final Report and Motion for Entry of Final Decree. The debtor has certified that the case has been fully administered. Based upon the Debtor's Final Report, the United States Trustee has no objection to the Court granting the Debtor's Motion for Final Decree. The United States Trustee reserves the right to seek to have the Final Decree vacated should any United States Trustee Quarterly Fees remain unpaid through date of closing by the court. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Ochs, Martin)
Related: [-]