Burbank v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Ford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02050 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Mon 04/29 2:52 PM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Craig S. Burbank. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Ray, Blake) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 8:42 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit and DIRECTING SERVICE on the Social Security Administration Commissioner and the US Attorney for the Western District/Arkansas via notice of electronic filing without prepayment of fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to note the date of service on the docket sheet. Further, the Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 17, 2024. (cla) |
|
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Wed 04/17 9:22 AM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (jlm) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 11:35 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Craig S. Burbank. (Ray, Blake) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Mon 04/15 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 4/29/2024.(jlm) |
|
Att: 1 consent/reassignment form | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Craig S. Burbank.(Ray, Blake) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 11:10 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Craig S. Burbank. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (jlm) |