Clauch v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barry A Bryant |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-06054 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Thu 04/25 9:27 PM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Staci Nicole Claunch. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Hurst, Justin) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Mon 04/15 4:14 PM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (jlm) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Mon 04/15 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 4/29/2024.(jlm) |
|
Att: 1 consent/reassignment form | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Mon 04/15 4:10 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Martin O'Malley for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Hurst, Justin) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF A SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY DECISION against Social Security Administration Commissioner ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-2961283), filed by Staci Nicole Claunch.(Hurst, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 12:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Staci Nicole Clauch. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (jlm) |