Smith et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Reona J Daly |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01105 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | The Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Illinois, 24LA00353 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mead Johnson & Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennara Marrow
|
|
Plaintiff
Dejuan Smith
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 04/26 10:20 AM
Docket Annotation - case was electronically transferred to Northern District of Illinois. (clw) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case to Other District
Fri 04/26 10:18 AM
CONDITION TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-61) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT. Case transferred to Northern District of Illinois.. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 4/26/2024. (clw) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 5:11 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/22 3:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 6/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/22/2024. (lmo) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Action
Mon 04/22 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF ACTION re7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms-0] . (adh) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice Requesting Consent
Mon 04/22 3:37 PM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. on 4/22/24. Consent due by 5/13/2024 (adh) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/18 3:48 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emilee Mae Bramstedt on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Bramstedt, Emilee) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by W. Jason Rankin on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Rankin, W.) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment
Tue 04/16 8:19 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Dejuan Smith, Jennara Marrow, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 3:24-cv-01105-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/7/2024 (aza) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 2:00 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser PLC (RB) for Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Anscombe, Anthony) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 1:58 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser PLC (RB) for Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Anscombe, Anthony) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Marie Noonan Witte on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Witte, Jamie) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Anscombe on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Anscombe, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/15 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 24LA00353 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number CILSDC-5365411), filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC.(Anscombe, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |