Procter v. Farmington Public Safety
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurie J Michelson |
Referred: | Curtis Ivy, Jr |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-10981 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oakland County Circuit Court, 24-206377-CZ |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Farmington Public Safety
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clark Procter
3901 Harris Lane
West Bloomfield Township, MI 48323 |
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/22 11:31 AM
ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN. ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson ) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 04/22 11:25 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS. (EPar) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/22 11:32 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Case Management Requirements,6 Order setting Scheduling Conference on Clark Procter at 3901 Harris Lane, West Bloomfield Township, MI 48323. (EPar) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/19 4:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Farmington Public Safety. (Debler, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Reassignment/Disqualification
Tue 04/16 10:56 AM
ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Paul D. Borman to District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (SSch) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
trial
Exhibit
Mon 04/15 3:09 PM
EXHIBIT Complaint re1 Notice of Removal, by Farmington Public Safety (Debler, Margaret) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Mon 04/15 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Farmington Public Safety from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 24-206377-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9751831 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Debler, Margaret) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Mon 04/15 3:47 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch) |