Dowdy v. O'Malley
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Phillips |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-03105 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 10:22 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth D Hatting on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Attorney Elizabeth D Hatting added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft))(Hatting, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
soc_sec
Notice of SSA Action Commenced
Mon 04/22 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Social Security Case. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has generated a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the U.S. Attorney's Office of the case filing. No summons shall issue. (Hanna, Jaime) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
sscmp
Complaint - Social Security
Mon 04/15 3:14 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of James R. Dowdy. (Filing fee $405 receipt number IFP) filed byKelsey Young on behalf of James R. Dowdy.(Young, Kelsey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 3:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS1 Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 1) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have twenty days from this date to electronically file the Complaint. Signed on 4/15/24 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 1:57 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of James R. Dowdy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/29/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Attorney Kelsey Young added to party James R. Dowdy(pty:pla))(Young, Kelsey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit complaint |