Starks v. O'Malley
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Roseann A Ketchmark |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-03104 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 3:11 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Matthew N. Sparks on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Attorney Matthew N. Sparks added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft))(Sparks, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
soc_sec
Notice of SSA Action Commenced
Wed 04/17 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Social Security Case. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has generated a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the U.S. Attorney's Office of the case filing. No summons shall issue. (Siegert, Karen) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
sscmp
Complaint - Social Security
Tue 04/16 11:16 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of Amber Starks. (Filing fee $405 receipt number IFP) filed byKelsey Young on behalf of Amber Starks.(Young, Kelsey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 11:08 AM
ORDER that after careful consideration and review,1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed on 4/16/2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan) |
|
2 | 2
order
Letter of reassignment
Tue 04/16 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. Judge Counts no longer associated with this case. Please note the new case number: 24-3104 CV-S-RK. (Melvin, Greg) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 1:38 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of Amber Starks. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/29/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Attorney Kelsey Young added to party Amber Starks(pty:pla))(Young, Kelsey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit complaint | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Mon 04/15 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to All Parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 5/6/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime) |