New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:24-cv-04964
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 7:27 AM EDT
Defendant
WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Plaintiff
ROBERT SHARPLES
Represented By
ELLIOT ELO
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
8 8 order Stipulation and Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Thu 06/13 8:56 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/12/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Tue 06/11 8:36 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBERT SHARPLES (ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 05/23 4:51 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/22/2024. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/23/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement (aty) Thu 05/23 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by ROBERT SHARPLES (ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/17 11:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT SHARPLES. WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, LLC served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
3 3 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 05/01 2:27 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT SHARPLES as to WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/16 12:51 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/15 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT against WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15283453) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ROBERT SHARPLES.(ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/15 4:16 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
Related: [-]