Lusk v. Midland Credit Management Inc
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | David L Russell |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00381 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 2:14 PM CDT |
Defendant
Midland Credit Management Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Courtney Lusk
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to
Thu 04/18 10:30 AM
ORDER granting4 Plaintiff's Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 04/18/2024. (km) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Tue 04/16 11:32 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4410577. (Wilson, Jeffrey) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Leave
Mon 04/15 6:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to waive local counsel requirement by Courtney Lusk. (Wilson, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/15 6:42 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Wilson on behalf of Courtney Lusk (Wilson, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 9:51 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Midland Credit Management Inc. (ekw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 9:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management Inc filed by Courtney Lusk.(ekw) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |