Diaz v. EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Savage |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01549 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 240301818 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
1299 Zurich Way
Schaumburg, IL 60196 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
TERRELL JOHNSON
6052 N. 2nd Street
Philadelphia, PA 19120 |
|
Defendant
Sixt Rent A Car, LLC
3601 Island Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19153 |
|
Plaintiff
Bismary Diaz
Administrator of the Estate of Angel Aviles 2923 Mascher Street
Philadelphia, PA 19124 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report Of
Wed 05/01 2:32 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) by EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SYKEN, MARC) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 04/29 3:28 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS RELATING [TO] DEFENDANT EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY[S] MOTION TO DISMISS8 , IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY IS STAYED PENDING DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/29/24.4/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Stay
Mon 04/29 12:17 PM
First MOTION to Stay Proceedings Relating Defendant Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company Motion to Dismiss filed by Bismary Diaz..(CIANFRANI, ANTHONY) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Thu 04/25 10:53 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND (DOC. NO. 6), IT IS ORDERED THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY 7, 2024, AT 9:00 A.M., IS CANCELLED PENDING DISPOSITION OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/25/2024. 4/25/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Remand to State Court
Wed 04/24 4:08 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bismary Diaz.Memorandum.(CIANFRANI, ANTHONY) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 04/19 3:57 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service.(SYKEN, MARC) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 04/17 11:00 AM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/7/2024 09:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/17/2024. 4/17/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Tue 04/16 3:46 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, ) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by NEIL ANTHONY TORTORA on behalf of TERRELL JOHNSON (TORTORA, NEIL) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Attorney)
Mon 04/15 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17399048), filed by EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SYKEN, MARC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service |