Watters v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | W Scott Hardy |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00567 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15 LLC
650 Dundee Road
Northbrook, PA 60062 |
|
Defendant
EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
1550 Peachtree Street NW
Atlanta, GA 30309 |
|
Defendant
EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
475 Anton Boulevard
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Watters
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/22 4:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Kunkel, Danielle) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Roskovensky on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Fri 04/19 1:24 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Equifax Information Services, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/19 1:22 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC Answer due from EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC on 5/6/2024. (Roskovensky, Vincent) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/16 10:57 AM
Judge W. Scott Hardy Presiding. (rtm) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Mon 04/15 3:08 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Experian plc. as corporate parent or other affiliate by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Kunkel, Danielle) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required)
Mon 04/15 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number 24-AR-001734. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8216393), filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Kunkel, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent to Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Consent to Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |