Chesterfield County, South Carolina v. Meta Platforms et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02222 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 1:08 PM PDT |
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
ByteDance Inc. 1920 Olympic Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90404 |
|
Defendant
Youtube LLC.
Corporation Servcie Company 251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
|
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
|
|
Defendant
TikTok LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
|
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
TikTok Inc. 5800 Bristol Parkway Suite 100
Culver City, CA 90230 |
|
Defendant
Snap Inc.
3000 31st Street
Santa Monica, CA 90405 |
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms
2710 GATEWAY OAKS DRIVE SUITE 150N
SACRAMENTO, CA 95833 |
|
Defendant
Meta Payments Inc.
Corporation Service Company 251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
|
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 |
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
1601 S California Ave
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Facebook Holdings, LLC
2710 Gateway Oaks Drive Suite 150N
Sacramento, CA 95833 |
|
Defendant
BYTEDANCE, LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
Chesterfield County, South Carolina
101 West Elm Street, Suite 520
Conshohocken, PA 19428 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/22 8:28 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Short Form Complaint served on META PLATFORMS, INC., FACEBOOK HOLDINGS, LLC, FACEBOOK PAYMENTS, INC., META PAYMENTS, INC., FACEBOOK OPERATIONS, LLC, INSTAGRAM, LLC, SICULUS, INC., SNAP INC., TIKTOK INC., TIKTOK LLC, TIKTOK LTD, BYTEDANCE, INC., BYTEDANCE LTD, GOOGLE LLC, YOUTUBE LLC on April 17, 2024, filed by Chesterfield County, South Carolina.(Cappelli, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Electronic Service Email, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 4.17.24 - Marc J. Bern & Partners LLP - School District Government Entity Status Report | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frank F Voler (Voler, Frank) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 10:09 AM
Summons Issued as to BYTEDANCE, LTD, ByteDance Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments Inc., Meta Platforms, Siculus, Inc., Snap Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd, Youtube LLC.. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/16 6:51 AM
Proposed Summons.(Cappelli, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Additional Defendants | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/15 1:22 PM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 12:57 PM
COMPLAINT (with Jury Demand) (No Process) Short Form Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19319900.). Filed by Chesterfield County, South Carolina.(Cappelli, Joseph) Modified on 4/15/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Additional Defendant | ||
utility
MDL Member Case
Mon 04/15 1:54 PM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 4:22-MD-03047-YGR (Meta) Opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-2222-YGR cc: JPMDL (anj, COURT STAFF) |