Leviathan Offshore, LLC v. Baker Marine Solutions, LLC
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00938 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Marine Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 3:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
Baker Marine Solutions, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Leviathan Offshore, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 04/19 9:44 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re3 Waiver of Service Executed **Filing attorney did not enter date for the date waiver sent to party; waiver sent on 4/16/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. No further action is necessary.** (my) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/18 4:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; (Schwank, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 04/15 3:25 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Baker Marine Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10487419) filed by Leviathan Offshore, LLC.Attorney Daniel Ernst Schwank added to party Leviathan Offshore, LLC(pty:pla).(Schwank, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet includes Attachment 1 |