Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Manish S Shah
Case #: 1:24-cv-03019
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 4:40 AM CDT
Defendant
MV Transportation, Inc.
Littler Mendelson, P.C. 321 North Clark Street Suite 1000
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
David Kruger
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Orly Michal Henry
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Short
Represented By
Paul T. Geske
Mcguire Law, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Carlos Ousley-Brown
Terminated: 06/19/2024
Represented By
Andrew T. Heldut
Mcguire Law, P.C.
contact info
Paul T. Geske
Mcguire Law, P.C.
contact info
Colin Primo Buscarini
Mcguire Law P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/30/2024 6:26 AM CDT
Monday, April 15, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (khg, )
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, Chancery Division, Illinois, case number (2024CH01309) filed by MV Transportation, Inc. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21856683.(Henry, Orly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Exhibit 1 - State Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to Adverse Party,
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice to State Court
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Henry, Orly)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MV Transportation, Inc. by Orly Michal Henry (Henry, Orly)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MV Transportation, Inc. (Henry, Orly)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE by MV Transportation, Inc. /Notice to Adverse Party of Filing Notice of Removal (Henry, Orly)
Related: [-]