Hendricks v. Citron, LLC et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Erin Aslan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01094 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 4:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Citron, LLC
Serve on: Charles Levine, 11 Gwynns Mill Court
Owings Mills, MD 21117 |
|
Defendant
Charles Levine
11 Gwynns Mill Court
Owings Mills, MD 21117 |
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Hendricks
6332 Cattail Drive
Woodbine, MD 21797 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/26 2:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Hendricks. Citron, LLC served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024.(Staiti, Christopher) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/26 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Hendricks. Charles Levine served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024.(Staiti, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order
Thu 04/18 3:12 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 4/18/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 3:11 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Citron, LLC, Charles Levine.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 3:06 PM
NOTICE re4 Complaint by Joseph Hendricks Corrected Complaint (Staiti, Christopher) Modified on 4/18/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
5 | 5
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent/decline
Thu 04/18 1:29 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Staiti, Christopher) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Citron, LLC, Charles Levine ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11212591.), filed by Joseph Hendricks.(Staiti, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 04/18 12:17 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Joseph Hendricks was filed incorrectly. **All of these filings name Ryan Jollie rather than the defendant listed on the docket, Joseph Hendricks. A case for Ryan Jollie against the same defendants has already been filed at 24-cv-1126. Please file the correct Complaint, civil cover sheet, summons, and consent form for the Plaintiff listed on the docket (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
notice
25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan. Joseph Hendricks or counsel for Joseph Hendricks are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/2/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent/decline
Wed 04/17 4:36 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Staiti, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Citron, LLC, Charles Levine ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11210655.), filed by Joseph Hendricks.(Staiti, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |