13
|
|
13
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Thu 04/25 12:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer and Notice to take Deposition Upon Oral Examination served on Rosenbaum & Rosenbaum, P.C. on April 22, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores..(Bojbasa, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Wed 04/24 3:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Initial Conference Order served on Rosenbaum & Rosenbaum, P.C. on 4/23/24. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores..(Bojbasa, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Trafton Gammons on behalf of Alberta Mae Mcarthur..(Gammons, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 04/23 11:48 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: By April 24, 2024, Defendant shall serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff or her counsel and file proof of service. By April 26, 2024, Plaintiffs counsel shall file a notice of appearance. it is herebyORDERED that an initial conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 will be held on Tuesday, May 21, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. At the conference, the parties must be prepared to discuss the subjects set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)and (c). It is further ORDERED that counsel shall meet and confer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ.P. 26(f) no later than 21 days before the Initial Case Management Conference. No later than May 14, 2024, the parties shall file a Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Case Management Plan, via ECF, signed by counsel for each party. A template is available athttps://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-sarah-l-cave. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 5/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 4/23/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Mon 04/22 3:59 PM
NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Alberta Mae Mcarthur on 7/2/2024 at 10:00 a.m..Document filed by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores..(Bojbasa, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/22 3:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores..(Bojbasa, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Bojbasa on behalf of Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores..(Bojbasa, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 5:43 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/16/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 1:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/16 10:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/16 10:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/16 10:09 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 10:09 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael J. Crowley to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): civil cover sheet was not signed;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 4:05 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores..(Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 04/15 3:41 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores.(Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 3:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/15 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 804255/2024E. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29220704).Document filed by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores..(Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B - Affirmation of Service
|