Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-10526

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:24-ap-01054
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
PBC 200 Park Avenue, LLC dba Carr Workplaces
Represented By
PBC 200 Park Avenue, LLC dba Carr Workplaces
contact info
Defendant
PBC Foundry, LLC dba Carr Workplaces
Represented By
PBC Foundry, LLC dba Carr Workplaces
contact info
Defendant
Preferred Offices Properties, LLC dba Carr Workplaces
Represented By
Preferred Offices Properties, LLC dba Carr Workplaces
contact info
Defendant
Preferred Offices Properties II, LLC dba Carr Workplaces
Represented By
Preferred Offices Properties II, LLC dba Carr Workplaces
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Lauren N Gans
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
40 40 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/24 11:31 AM
Hearing Held Re:1 Status Conference Re: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Voidable - Off Calendar - Order Approving Stipulation To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Entered 3-12-25 - See Doc #38 (GD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 03/14 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
38 38 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Wed 03/12 5:11 PM
ORDER Approving Stipulation To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Stipulation shall be and hereby is approved in its entirety; 2. The above-captioned adversary proceeding shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice; 3. The parties shall bear their own costs, fees, and expenses associated with the above-captioned adversary proceeding. Signed on 3/12/2025 Related [+]. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
37 37 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 03/12 2:14 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Gans, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 02/13 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
35 35 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 02/13 11:52 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued To 4-24-25 at 10:00 A.M. Per Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Status Conference Entered 2-11-25 - See Doc #34 (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
34 34 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 02/11 2:23 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Stipulation is approved in its entirety; 2. The Status Conference set for February 13, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. , hereby is continued to April 24, 2025 at 10:00 a.m.. All related deadlines are continued concomitantly therewith. Signed on 2/11/2025 (GD)
Related: [-] 33
Monday, February 10, 2025
33 33 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 02/10 5:43 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Stipulation to Continue Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Zur, Roye)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/05 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
31 31 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 12/05 1:28 PM
Hearing Continued Re: Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued To 2-13-25 at 10:00 Per Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Status Conference Entered 12-03-24 - See Doc #29 (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
30 30 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 12/05 10:24 AM
Hearing Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/5/2024 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued To 12-05-24 At 11:00 A.M. Per Court's Own Motion - Notice Of Change Of Time Filed 11-26-24 - See Doc #27 (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
29 29 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 12/03 5:35 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Stipulation is approved in its entirety; 2. The Status Conference set for December 5, 2024 at 11:00 is continued to February 13, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. . All related deadlines are continued concomitantly therewith. Signed on 12/3/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] 28
28 28 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 12/03 2:12 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Stipulation To Continue Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Zur, Roye)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
27 27 notice Notice Tue 11/26 12:54 PM
Notice Of Change Of Time For Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Zur, Roye)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
26 26 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 11/07 1:53 PM
Hearing Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, October 24, 2024
25 25 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 10/24 2:35 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued To 11-07-24 At 10:00 A.M. Per Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Status Conference Entered 10-10-24 - See Doc #23 (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, October 12, 2024
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 10/12 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, October 10, 2024
23 23 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Thu 10/10 11:51 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Stipulation is approved in its entirety; 2. The Status Conference set for October 24, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. is continued to November 7, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. All related deadlines are continued concomitantly therewith. Signed on 10/10/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] 22
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
22 22 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 10/08 5:21 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Stipulation To Continue Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Zur, Roye)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
21 21 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 10/03 4:51 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 10/24/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to 10-24-24 at 10:00 A.M. Per Order Continuing Case Status Conference Entered 9-09-24 See Doc #17 (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 09/11 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 09/11 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)
Monday, September 09, 2024
18 18 misc Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF) Mon 09/09 12:37 PM
Notice to creditors Re: Order Continuing Case Status Conference (BNC-PDF) (GD)
Related: [-]
17 17 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Mon 09/09 11:32 AM
Order Continuing Case Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] A case status conference is set for hearing on September 26, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. That hearing is continued to October 24, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. Signed on 9/9/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, August 01, 2024
16 16 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 08/01 3:37 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 9/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to September 26, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, July 26, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/26 1:47 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by PBC 200 Park Avenue, LLC, PBC Foundry, LLC, Preferred Offices Properties II, LLC, Preferred Offices Properties, LLC. (Cummings, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
14 14 misc Status report Thu 07/25 3:27 PM
Status report Joint Status Report [LBR 7016-1(a)(2)] Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Zur, Roye)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Sunday, June 30, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 06/30 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, June 28, 2024
12 12 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Fri 06/28 9:39 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint To Avoid And Recover Voidable Transfers (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - It is hereby ORDERED: 1. The Stipulation is approved in its entirety; 2. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to July 26, 2024; 3. The Status Conference currently set for June 27, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. is continued to August 1, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. - Signed on 6/28/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, June 27, 2024
11 11 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 06/27 1:24 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 8/1/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to August 1, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
10 10 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 06/27 10:00 AM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Stipulation Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint To Avoid And Recover Voidable Transfers Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Gans, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 22, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 06/22 9:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
Thursday, June 20, 2024
8 8 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Thu 06/20 1:34 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) PBC 200 Park Avenue, LLC; PBC Foundry, LLC; Preferred Offices Properties, LLC; Preferred Offices Properties II, LLC Related [+] (JL)
Related: [-] 7 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Tue 06/18 4:05 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to PBC 200 Park Avenue, LLC; PBC Foundry, LLC; Preferred Offices Properties, LLC; and Preferred Offices Properties II, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Gans, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/26 2:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on PBC 200 Park Avenue, LLC 4/22/2024; PBC Foundry, LLC 4/22/2024; Preferred Offices Properties II, LLC 4/22/2024; Preferred Offices Properties, LLC 4/22/2024 (Gans, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 04/17 3:30 PM
Summons Issued on PBC 200 Park Avenue, LLC Date Issued 4/17/2024, Answer Due 5/17/2024; PBC Foundry, LLC Date Issued 4/17/2024, Answer Due 5/17/2024; Preferred Offices Properties II, LLC Date Issued 4/17/2024, Answer Due 5/17/2024; Preferred Offices Properties, LLC Date Issued 4/17/2024, Answer Due 5/17/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/27/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 04/17 1:05 PM
Summons Issued on PBC 200 Park Avenue, LLC Date Issued 4/17/2024, Answer Due 5/17/2024; PBC Foundry, LLC Date Issued 4/17/2024, Answer Due 5/17/2024; Preferred Offices Properties II, LLC Date Issued 4/17/2024, Answer Due 5/17/2024; Preferred Offices Properties, LLC Date Issued 4/17/2024, Answer Due 5/17/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/27/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD) - INCORRECT SUMMONS ISSUED Modified on 4/17/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
3 3 misc Errata Tue 04/16 5:05 PM
Errata Notice of Errata Re Complaint to Avoid and Recover Voidable Transfers Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Gans, Lauren)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, 2 Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Monday, April 15, 2024
2 2 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 04/15 5:56 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. Name: "PREFERED OFFICES PROPERTIES II, LLC CARR WORKPLACES" on the face page of the complaint is different than how it is listed in the complaint as "dba" Carr Workplaces. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF ERRATA TO CORRECT THE NAME. Related [+] (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, April 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/12 5:04 PM
Adversary case 8:24-ap-01054. Complaint by Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee against PBC 200 Park Avenue, LLC dba Carr Workplaces, PBC Foundry, LLC dba Carr Workplaces, Preferred Offices Properties, LLC dba Carr Workplaces, Preferred Offices Properties II, LLC dba Carr Workplaces. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Gans, Lauren)
Related: [-]