Henriquez v. Immigration & Customs Enforcement et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02225 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 2:13 PM PDT |
Defendant
Executive Office for Immigration Review
|
|
Defendant
Immigration & Customs Enforcement
|
|
Plaintiff
Jose Mauricio Henriquez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/30 7:55 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Immigrant Legal Defense.. (Zhang, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 04/25 12:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/25 9:24 AM
Proposed Summons. (Zhang, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 8:12 AM
Order. Signed 4/18/2024 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jessica Zhang.(klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 3:13 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19320660.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/15/2024 filed by Immigrant Legal Defense.(Zhang, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Letter of Good Standing | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 04/17 3:05 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Immigrant Legal Defense (Linares Garcia, Tania) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt #ACANDC-19320397 against All Defendants. Filed by Immigrant Legal Defense.(Linares Garcia, Tania) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 04/17 12:00 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/16 12:37 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 04/16 9:43 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Complaint - Plaintiff's name on complaint does not match the case title in ECF. Please correct. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Jose Mauricio Henriquez (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 04/16 2:09 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .Plaintiff's name on the Pro Hac Application does not match the case title in ECF. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 2 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19320660.) filed by Jose Mauricio Henriquez This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. (klh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/15 2:18 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19320660.) filed by Jose Mauricio Henriquez.(Zhang, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Letter of Good Standing | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19320397.). Filed by Jose Mauricio Henriquez.(Linares Garcia, Tania) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certification of Conflicts |