Rivera v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | James S Moody, Jr |
Referred: | Philip R Lammens |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00187 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Fifth Judicial Circuit, Marion County FL, 24SC000925AX |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kristalina Rivera
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/30 11:30 AM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 13 Notice of Settlement. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/30/2024. (SMB) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of settlement
Tue 04/30 11:04 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Kristalina Rivera (Scarangella, Bridget) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 4:35 PM
ORDER re 3 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/29/2024. (MJT) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kristalina Rivera. (Scarangella, Bridget) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 04/25 2:43 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kristalina Rivera. Related case(s): No (Scarangella, Bridget) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/25 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bridget Lynn Scarangella on behalf of Kristalina Rivera. Lead Counsel: Bridget Scarangella. (Scarangella, Bridget) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/22 10:03 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 Equifax Information Services, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to May 22, 2024. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/22/2024. (SMB) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 04/18 5:29 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related case(s): No (Joffe, Jason) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 5:29 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Joffe, Jason) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Thu 04/18 5:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Joffe, Jason) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/18 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason Daniel Joffe on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Lead Counsel: Jason Daniel Joffe. (Joffe, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Thu 04/18 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (MJT) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/17 11:19 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:24-cv-187-JSM-PRL. (ARL) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court, Fifth Judicial Circuit, Marion County, FL, case number 24SC000925AX filed in State Court on February 22, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21989235 filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Joffe, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - State Court Docs., | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |