Russell v. MegaAgentHawaii LLC
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Rom Trader |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00171 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 11:17 AM HST |
Defendant
Doe Corporations 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Entities 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Partnerships 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 10 inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
MegaAgentHawaii LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jonathon Russell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 1:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO TARYN R. MURRAY, ESQ. re11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/26/2024. (eta) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 04/24 11:24 AM
Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 3096 re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Taryn R. Murray Filing fee $ 300. (eta) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 9:14 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Taryn R. Murray Filing fee $ 300.Jesse J.T. Smith appearing for Plaintiff Jonathon Russell(Smith, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
misc
Court's Certificate of Service
Thu 04/18 10:28 AM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of1 Complaint and10 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright was served by email to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office at 508filings@loc.gov on April 18, 2024. (eta) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 10:15 AM
NOTICE by Jonathon Russell Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright Jonathon Russell. (Smith, Jesse) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 10:03 AM
CIVIL Cover Sheet by Jonathon Russell. (Smith, Jesse) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Transmittal of Documents
Mon 04/15 9:47 AM
TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Counsel for Plaintiff - Please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright . For e-filing purposes , please file the form using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will then transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (eta) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 9:42 AM
Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Mon 04/15 9:41 AM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Mon 04/15 9:38 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/10/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/15/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 9:35 AM
Summons Issued as to MegaAgentHawaii LLC. (eta) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 04/15 9:35 AM
Filing fee: $ 405, Pay.gov Tracking ID: 27DJRIH4 re1 Complaint (eta) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 04/15 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00171 DKW-RT on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 8:46 AM
COMPLAINT against MegaAgentHawaii LLC dba Deep Blue HI (Filing fee $ 405.), filed by Jonathon Russell.(Smith, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B", | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "C", | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "D", | ||
Att: 5 Demand for Jury Trial, | ||
Att: 6 Summons |