Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:24-cv-00154
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilites Act
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By
Meg D Karnig PHV
Littler Mendelson Pc - Chi/il
contact info
Ryan J Sterling
Littler Mendelson Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Diehl
Represented By
Andrew Dutkanych, III
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Sarah Guffey
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 04, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Fri 10/04 10:21 AM
ORDER GRANTING:28 Stipulation to Dismiss and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party bearing its own costs. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Cristal C Brisco on 10/4/2024. (eeb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
28 28 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Thu 10/03 5:11 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
27 27 1 pgs misc Clerks Judgment Wed 09/11 1:50 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (lns)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 09/11 1:49 PM
ORDER GRANTING22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. The claims in Pla's amended complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Cristal C Brisco on 9/11/2024. (lns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
25 25 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 08/13 11:56 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiff granted to and including 8/27/2024 to file a response to22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Deadline for Defendant to file a Reply is 9/3/2024. Text entry order. (mr) Modified on 8/13/2024 to correct deadline (mr).
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
24 24 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/09 8:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Angela Diehl. (Guffey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
23 23 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 07/23 3:14 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 07/23 2:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 07/23 1:19 PM
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Cristal C Brisco on 07/19/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
20 20 8 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/09 3:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Schneider Electric USA, Inc., filed by Christopher Diehl.(Guffey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
19 19 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 06/20 12:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/20 12:27 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/11 3:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 8/15/2024. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 5/14/2025. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 1/14/2025; and from Defendant by 3/14/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 9/13/2024; as to Defendant is 10/14/2024. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 6/16/2025. The parties are directed to file a Notice with the Court advising of their selection of a mediator should the case proceed with mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/11/24. (nhc)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Tue 06/11 10:46 AM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/11/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Sarah Guffey. Dft appeared by attys Ryan Sterling and Meg Karnig. The15 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Parties are directed to file a notice with the Court advising of their selection of a mediator should the case proceed with mediation. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
15 15 4 pgs misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Thu 06/06 4:42 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 06/06 11:01 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is granted. Defendant granted to and including 6/20/2024 to file an Answer to1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
13 13 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 06/05 3:59 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
12 12 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 05/17 8:41 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Fri 05/17 8:40 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/15 2:35 PM
ORDER granting9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Meg D Karnig PHV for Schneider Electric USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/15/2024. (ace)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/13 9:35 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE8 Agreed Notice, Schneider Electric USA, Inc answer due 6/10/2024 (nae)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
9 9 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/10 3:45 PM
Application for Attorney Megan Karnig to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, INC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5570328(Karnig, Meg)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Fri 05/10 12:02 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. ; answer due by June 10, 2024. (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/10 12:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries S A S, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric S E for Schneider Electric USA, Inc... (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/10 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J Sterling on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Sterling, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
5 5 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/22 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Diehl. Schneider Electric USA, Inc. served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/16 7:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ash)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/16 7:57 AM
Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Guffey on behalf of CHRISTOPHER DIEHL (Guffey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of CHRISTOPHER DIEHL (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/15 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Schneider Electric USA, Inc.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5545380.), filed by CHRISTOPHER DIEHL.(Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons