Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Georgia N Alexakis
Case #: 1:24-cv-03024
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 4:41 AM CDT
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Defendant
Leetronics Corporation
Defendant
Eliran Yadid
Plaintiff
Klein Tools, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Jason Singer
Matt Singer Law, LLC
contact info
Daniel C F Wucherer
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2024 4:40 PM CDT
Monday, April 15, 2024
1 1 53 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Klein Tools, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21857201.(Wucherer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wucherer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Klein Tools, Inc. by Daniel C F Wucherer (Wucherer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Klein Tools, Inc. (Wucherer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent Or Trademark by Klein Tools, Inc. (Wucherer, Daniel)
Related: [-]