New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Referred: Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:24-cv-02810
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Jimmy Duff
Represented By
Jason Mizrahi
Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Joshua Levin-Epstein
Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Duff's Brooklyn LLC
Represented By
Jason Mizrahi
Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Joshua Levin-Epstein
Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Matthew Weinick
Plaintiff
Alona Cheborak
Represented By
Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Lipsky Lowe LLP
contact info
Douglas Brian Lipsky
Lipsky Lowe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosie Duke
Represented By
Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Lipsky Lowe LLP
contact info
Douglas Brian Lipsky
Lipsky Lowe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Irrizarry
Represented By
Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Lipsky Lowe LLP
contact info
Douglas Brian Lipsky
Lipsky Lowe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Anthony Kantorski
Represented By
Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Lipsky Lowe LLP
contact info
Douglas Brian Lipsky
Lipsky Lowe LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
17 17 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 03/05 2:16 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs Nicole Irrizarry, Rosie Duke Alona Cheborak and Brian Anthony Kantorski and against Defendants, Duffs Brooklyn LLC and Jimmy Duff, jointly, in the amount of $15,000.00, which is inclusive of all attorneys' fees, all costs, and other damages of any kind sought Plaintiffs seek in this action; and that in exchange for this offer, Plaintiffs Nicole Irrizarry, Rosie Duke Alona Cheborak and Brian Anthony Kantorski will release, and forever discharge, Defendants, and their officers, agents, and employees from all claims and damages stated in the Complaint and any and all claims and damages that could have been stated in the Complaint. Signed by Deputy Clerk, Jalitza Poveda, on behalf of Clerk of Court, Brenna B. Mahoney, on 3/5/2025. (JP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Tue 03/04 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Alona Cheborak, Rosie Duke, Nicole Irrizarry, Brian Anthony Kantorski (Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]
notice Notice(Other) Tue 03/04 2:37 PM
NOTICE: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68(a) requires that parties file "the offer and notice of acceptance, plus proof of service." Parties have submitted the offer and notice of acceptance, but not proof of service. Please refile with the appropriate documents. re15 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment (JP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Mon 03/03 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Alona Cheborak, Rosie Duke, Nicole Irrizarry, Brian Anthony Kantorski (Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
order Scheduling Order Thu 01/16 12:37 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference has been scheduled for April 8, 2025 at 1:00 PM, before the Hon. Robert M. Levy, USMJ. Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/16/2025. (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
14 14 misc Status Report Tue 01/14 7:26 PM
STATUS REPORT Case Not Settled by Nicole Irrizarry, Rosie Duke, Alona Cheborak, Brian Anthony Kantorski (Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Tue 12/17 4:36 PM
REPORT of Mediation Settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 1/2/2025. (JR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
adr Selection of Mediator Wed 10/09 5:01 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Matthew Weinick selected as Mediator. Date Time and Location in-person/remote: November 12, 2024 Related [+]. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation. For more details on the submission, please consult Local Civil Rule 83.8(b)(4). Attendance is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Mediators contact information can be found on the docket sheet. Within fourteen days of the conclusion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report. (JR)
Related: [-] mote
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Tue 10/01 2:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Sarah Isaacson, Jason Mizrahi. Case management order adopted. Fact discovery deadline 4/1/25. Case referred to EDNY FLSA Mediation Panel. Counsel shall exchange all necessary documents for the mediation, as discussed at this conference. Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/1/2024 (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 10/01 2:52 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to FLSA Mediation Panel. Mediation shall be completed by 12/31/24Selection of Mediator due by 10/15/2024.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/1/2024. (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Tue 10/01 3:03 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. Counsel are to select a mediator, contact the mediator to schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place (in-person or remote) of the first mediation session using the Selection of the Mediator Form on the ADR Forms website under Mediator Forms/For Counsel and Parties: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms or via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators, their qualifications and contact information, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1). The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (JR)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 09/30 4:09 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
12 12 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 08/12 12:41 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Jimmy Duff, Duff's Brooklyn LLC. (Mizrahi, Jason)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 08/12 2:40 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The telephone conference scheduled for 8/20/24 is adjourned to 10/01/24 at 2:00 PM. Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/12/2024. (JM) Modified, to add time of next tel conf on 8/12/2024 (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 08/08 10:15 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/11 8:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for August 20, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. , before the Hon. Robert M. Levy, USMJ. Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/11/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IC Questionnaire,
Att: 2 Individual Rules
Monday, July 01, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/01 2:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Jimmy Duff, Duff's Brooklyn LLC. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/01 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Mizrahi on behalf of Jimmy Duff, Duff's Brooklyn LLC (aty to be noticed) (Mizrahi, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/01 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Levin-Epstein on behalf of Jimmy Duff, Duff's Brooklyn LLC (aty to be noticed) (Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 06/28 9:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Anthony Kantorski, Nicole Irrizarry, Alona Cheborak, Rosie Duke. Jimmy Duff waiver sent on 5/1/2024, answer due 7/1/2024; Duff's Brooklyn LLC waiver sent on 5/1/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. (Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/17 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Jacqueline Isaacson on behalf of Alona Cheborak, Rosie Duke, Nicole Irrizarry, Brian Anthony Kantorski (aty to be noticed) (Isaacson, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/16 7:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Jimmy Duff, Duff's Brooklyn LLC. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/16 7:32 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 04/16 7:32 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/16 7:29 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/15 5:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Jimmy Duff, Duff's Brooklyn LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17775777 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Brian Anthony Kantorski, Nicole Irrizarry, Alona Cheborak, Rosie Duke. (Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons