Ferguson v. Credit One LLC
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Louise Wood Flanagan |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00222 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:20 PM EDT |
Defendant
Credit One LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Keith L. Ferguson
19 Rotherham Drive
Clayton, NC 27527 |
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 3:54 PM
ORDER OF DEFICIENCY - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/25/2024. Copy mailed to Keith L. Ferguson at 19 Rotherham Drive, Clayton, NC 27527 (Collins, S) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 04/16 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure
Tue 04/16 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Keith L. Ferguson. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 3:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ( short form ), filed by Keith L. Ferguson. (Rudd, D.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Credit One LLC, filed by Keith L. Ferguson. (Rudd, D.) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |