Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:24-cv-01763
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Case in other court:Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, 24 CV 002156
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 7:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Envoy Air Inc.
Represented By
Becky L. Kalas
Fordharrison
contact info
Michael P. Karst
Kastner, Westman & Wilkins, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aman Muse
3556 Providence Glen Drive
Columbus, OH 43219


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 23, 2024
10 10 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 05/23 11:55 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the May 23, 2024 Opinion and Order: The Court grants6 the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
9 9 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 05/23 11:51 AM
OPINION and ORDER granting6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/23/2024. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/24 10:16 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Becky L. Kalas as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/24/2024. (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
7 7 respm Supplemental - Supporting Tue 04/23 12:46 PM
Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9920331) of Becky L. Kalas filed by Defendant Envoy Air Inc.. (Karst, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois
Monday, April 22, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/22 3:24 PM
Proposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) by Defendant Envoy Air Inc.. (Karst, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Tue 04/16 8:58 AM
Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Document:3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9920331) of Becky L. Kalas filed by Envoy Air Inc. Deficiency Deadline by 4/30/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Tue 04/16 8:52 AM
COMPLAINT filed originally in Franklin County CCP on 3/14/2024 by Aman Muse against Envoy Air Inc. (er)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
3 3 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/15 4:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9920331) of Becky L. Kalas by Defendant Envoy Air Inc.. (Karst, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/15 3:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Envoy Air Inc., American Airlines Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group, Inc. for Envoy Air Inc... (Karst, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 04/15 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing from Franklin County Common Pleas, case number 24 CV 002156 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9920212), filed by Envoy Air Inc.. (Karst, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint State Docs,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Christopher St. James,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing - State Court