KREISER v. COMENITY BANK
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Baylson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01551 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Court of Common Pleas, Montgomery County, 24-04729 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
COMENITY BANK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRAVIS KREISER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Answer Deadline
Fri 04/19 10:48 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COMENITY BANK'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 5/7/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/19/24. 4/19/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/19 10:08 AM
STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond by COMENITY BANK. (Patel, Kruti) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 1:50 PM
NOTICE by COMENITY BANK re1 Notice of Removal (IFP or Government Filer), Designation Form (Patel, Kruti) |
|
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case / Complaint / Notice of Removal)
Wed 04/17 12:39 PM
Filing Fee for CIVIL CASE, COMPLAINT or NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COMENITY BANK. (Filing Fee $405, receipt number APAEDC-17405291). (Patel, Kruti) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Tue 04/16 3:35 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County. (CCP - Montgomery County, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (IFP or Government Filer)
Tue 04/16 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COMENITY BANK from Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, case number 2024-04729., filed by COMENITY BANK.(Patel, Kruti) (Filing Fee to be paid separately) Modified on 4/16/2024 (md) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Tue 04/16 4:01 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt) |
||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Tue 04/16 4:21 PM
Attorneys are required to pay the $405 Filing Fee. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to pay the filing fee in this case using the Filing Fee (Civil Case/Complaint/Notice of Removal). (sbt) |