Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC
Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John W Kolwe |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20176 |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC
2306 E Burton St
Sulphur, LA 70663-2928 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
DIP
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:02 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 04/25 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
order
Enroll Attorney
Tue 04/23 7:56 AM
Order Granting (micc) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors
Fri 04/19 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to DIP
Thu 04/18 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to DIP. . Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
20 | 20
petdoc
Statement of Operations (Small Business)
Thu 04/18 9:24 AM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 2024 YTD | ||
19 | 19
petdoc
Cash Flow Statement (Small Business)
Thu 04/18 9:19 AM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/17 4:25 PM
Certificate of Service Motion for Approval of Interim Payments of Compensation Deposit for Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Armistead M. Long on behalf of Armistead Mason Long (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee) (Long, Armistead) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)
Wed 04/17 4:13 PM
Notice of Hearing (Served) on Re: (16 Miscellaneous Motion) Motion for Approval of Interim Payments of Compensation Deposit for Subchapter V Trustee . Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Filed by Armistead M. Long on behalf of Armistead Mason Long (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee) (Long, Armistead) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Motion (Generic)
Wed 04/17 3:50 PM
Motion for Approval of Interim Payments of Compensation Deposit for Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Armistead M. Long on behalf of Armistead Mason Long (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee) (Long, Armistead) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
court
First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 11
Wed 04/17 9:52 AM
Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/20/2024 at 01:00 PM at 341 Meeting - Telephone Conference, UST. Call: 866-762-6425, Passcode: 8530051#. (micc) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
trustee
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee
Wed 04/17 9:25 AM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee 341 Meeting to be held telephonically, call 866-762-6425, Passcode, 85300051# . Armistead Mason Long (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee) added to the case. 341 Meeting Date: 05/20/24. 341 Meeting Time: 1:00 p.m.. Location: 341 Meeting - Telephone Conference, UST. Filed by Office of U. S. Trustee(Drew, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Verified Statement - Long | ||
utility
Terminate Trustee
Wed 04/17 9:46 AM
Terminated Trustee: DIP terminated. (micc) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Tue 04/16 3:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice . Filed by Robert J. Tete on behalf of Stine, L.L.C. d/b/a Stine Lumber Company (Tete, Robert) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Tue 04/16 3:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice . Filed by Richard Drew on behalf of Office of U. S. Trustee (Drew, Richard) |
|
11 | 11
petdoc
Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID
Tue 04/16 10:18 AM
Declaration Re Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN, Picture ID Copy, Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order to Debtor in Possession and Status Conference Option
Tue 04/16 9:58 AM
Order to Debtor in Possession and Setting Status Conference.Status Conference Hearing to be held on 6/12/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Chapter 11 Pre-Status Conference Report due by 5/29/2024. Filed on 4/16/2024 (micc) |
|
9 | 9
petdoc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Tue 04/16 8:09 AM
List of Creditors who have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims against you and are Not Insiders for Non-Individual Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
crditcrd
Autodocket US Treasury Receipt
Tue 04/16 8:59 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-20176 ) [petdoc,volp11a] (1738.00) . Receipt Number A24368936, in the Amount of $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)
Mon 04/15 4:35 PM
Notice of Hearing (Served) on Re: (7 Application to Employ) with Certificate of Service . Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Mailing Matrix | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
motion
Employ
Mon 04/15 4:33 PM
Application to Employ Jennifer Rulon as Managing Member as an Insider of the Debtor with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)
Mon 04/15 4:06 PM
Notice of Hearing (Served) on Re: (5 Miscellaneous Motion) Fix Bar Date with Certificate of Service . Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Mailing Matrix | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Motion (Generic)
Mon 04/15 4:04 PM
Motion To Fix Bar Date for Filing Claims and Interests with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Mailing Matrix | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Motion (Generic)
Mon 04/15 3:38 PM
Motion for Order to Waive FRBP 6003 with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Enroll Attorney
Mon 04/15 3:36 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Enroll Attorney with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of proposed counsel | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Retainer Agreement | ||
2 | 2
petdoc
Corporate Resolution
Mon 04/15 3:34 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC (Kelly, Wade) |
|
1 | 1
40
pgs
petdoc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Fee)
Mon 04/15 3:25 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual All Schedules, Statements and Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney. Fee Amount Due $1738 Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Apex Disaster Specialists Louisiana, LLC. Declaration of ECF Filing due by 04/17/2024. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Small Business Plan due by 07/15/2024. (Kelly, Wade) |