Bacher v. Penn Aluminum International, LLC
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Phil Gilbert |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01113 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Penn Aluminum International, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Natalie Bacher
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 8:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Penn Aluminum International, LLC. Original summons mailed to Attorney Badwan. (tkm) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice Requesting Consent
Tue 04/16 7:46 AM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Natalie Bacher to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Natalie Bacher on 4/16/2024. Consent due by 5/7/2024 (tkm) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Opening Notification
Tue 04/16 7:43 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 24-1113 JPG. (tkm) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mohammed O. Badwan on behalf of Natalie Bacher (Badwan, Mohammed) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Penn Aluminum International, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5365828.), filed by Natalie Bacher.(Badwan, Mohammed) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B |