Graham v. Lillard
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen P Mcglynn |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01110 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Prisoner
Fri 04/26 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (kare) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/25 1:22 PM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kare) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 04/23 11:31 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/23/2024. (anb2) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 04/23 10:59 AM
ORDER: Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in United States District Courts provides that upon preliminary consideration by the district court judge, [i]f it plainly appears from the petition and any attached exhibits that the petitioner is not entitled to relief in the district court, the judge must dismiss the petition and direct the clerk to notify the petitioner. Rule 1(b) gives this Court the authority to apply the Rules to other habeas corpus cases. Under very limited circumstances, a prisoner may challenge his federal conviction or sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2241. This is not one of those circumstances. "[A] criminal forfeiture is part of the defendant's sentence and must be challenged on direct appeal or not at all." Young v. U.S., 489 F.3d 313, 315 (7th Cir. 2007) (collecting cases). As a result, Petitioner William Charles Graham's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 (Doc.1 ) is DENIED. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/23/2024. (anb2) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 04/22 11:31 AM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 8955 (clw) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Requesting Consent
Mon 04/15 3:21 PM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Petitioner to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Petitioner on 4/15/2024. Consent due by 5/6/2024 (kare) |
|
2 | 2
4
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 3:20 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Your case number is 24-1110 SPM. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $5.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within fourteen days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/15/2024. (kare) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 04/15 3:18 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Charles Graham.(kare) |