Hayes v. Shawnee County Board of County Commissioners
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Eric F Melgren |
Referred: | Rachel E Schwartz |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04030 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:12 PM CDT |
Defendant
Shawnee County Board of County Commissioners
|
|
Plaintiff
Marcus Hayes
1031 SE Hancock
Topeka, KS 66607 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/25 9:27 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mr. Hayes has until May 29, 2024 to either file a new motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a complete affidavit of his financial status, or pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 4/25/2024. Filed Order and blank copies of the United States District Court for the District of Kansas forms of Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit of Financial Status mailed to pro se party Marcus Hayes 1031 SE Hancock Topeka, KS 66607 by regular mail. (ca) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 4:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marcus Hayes. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (nac) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - Proof of Income | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 4:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Marcus Hayes. (nac) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Marcus Hayes.(nac) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Right to Sue | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 04/15 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac) |