Laufer Group International, Ltd. v. Baillie Lumber Co., LP et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02848 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333ad Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 6:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Baillie Lumber Co., LP
4002 Legion Drive
Hamburg, NY 14075 |
|
Defendant
Jason Kelley
4002 Legion Drive
Hamburg, NY 14075 |
|
Defendant
Jeff Meyer
Baillie Lumber Co., LP 4002 Legion Drive
Hamburg, NY 14075 |
|
Plaintiff
Laufer Group International, Ltd.
20 Vesey Street Suite 601
New York, NY 10007 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 3:40 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Kelley. (vf) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 3:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeff Meyer. (vf) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 3:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baillie Lumber Co., LP. (vf) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/18 12:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Kelley, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Laufer Group International, Ltd...(Collins, Brendan) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/18 12:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeff Meyer, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Laufer Group International, Ltd...(Collins, Brendan) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/18 12:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Baillie Lumber Co., LP, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Laufer Group International, Ltd...(Collins, Brendan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 12:16 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laufer Group International, Ltd...(Collins, Brendan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/18 12:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Collins, Brendan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 12:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Baillie Lumber Co., LP, Jason Kelley, Jeff Meyer. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29236117)Document filed by Laufer Group International, Ltd...(Collins, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Credit and Security Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Bill of Lading | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/18 3:32 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/18 3:33 PM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/18 3:33 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading
Tue 04/16 12:02 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brendan Collins to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/22/2024. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 12:03 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Brendan Collins. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |