In the Matter of: Lahaina Charter Boats, Inc.
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Rom Trader |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00174 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 2:11 PM HST |
Plaintiff
Lahaina Charter Boats, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 11:42 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lahaina Charter Boats, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Errata
Tue 04/16 11:40 AM
Errata re1 Complaint, .(Lezy, Normand) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Mon 04/15 4:06 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (jni) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 4:04 PM
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Mon 04/15 4:04 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/10/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/15/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 04/15 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00174 LEK-RT on all further pleadings . (jni) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against Lahaina Charter Boats, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2988575.), filed by Lahaina Charter Boats, Inc..(Lezy, Normand) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Harry Guiang, SAMS-AMS, MIIMS, Attesting to the Fair Market Value of SPV Great White, O.N. 972709, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |