Kirkinis v. Too Good To Go, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger T Benitez |
Referred: | Allison H Goddard |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00678 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02023-00049370-CU- |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 50
|
|
Defendant
Too Good To Go, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodore Kirkinis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
9
pgs
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Tue 04/16 8:22 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference via videoconference. Early Neutral Evaluation via videoconference set for 6/5/2024 at 2:00pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 4/15/2024.(jpp) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 3:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Too Good To Go, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Simpler, Phillip) (jpp) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Mon 04/15 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Too Good To Go, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Simpler, Phillip) (jpp) |
|
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 04/15 3:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Too Good To Go, Inc. (axi) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/15 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BCASDC-18760354.), filed by Too Good To Go, Inc. The new case number is 3:24-cv-678-BEN-AHG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (axi) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael Bookser, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Phillip Simpler |