Mercer v. New York City Police Dept. 47 Precint et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02827 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bronx County Family Court
|
|
Defendant
District Attorney Darcel D. Clark
|
|
Defendant
Susan Schieifer Levy
|
|
Defendant
New York City Police Dept. 47 Precint
|
|
Defendant
Detective Christopher Sally
|
|
Defendant
Officer Sutton
|
|
Plaintiff
Ira Mercer
113 Father Zeiser Place Apt. 2A
Bronx, NY 10468 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Fri 04/19 2:08 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Ira Mercer 113 Father Zeiser Place Apt. 2A Bronx, NY 10468. (rdz) |
||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Fri 04/19 2:08 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Ira Mercer 113 Father Zeiser Place Apt. 2A Bronx, NY 10468. (rdz) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Thu 04/18 10:53 AM
CIVIL JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the April 17, 2024, order, this action is dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/17/2024) (nb) |
|
Att: 1 Appeal Package | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Thu 04/18 10:51 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court dismisses this action without prejudice as duplicative of the case under docket number 24-CV-2803. All other pending matters in this action are terminated. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in this case. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/17/2024) (nb) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Wed 04/17 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Tue 04/16 10:58 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Ira Mercer 113 Father Zeiser Place Apt. 2A Bronx, NY 10468. (nb) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order
Mon 04/15 4:14 PM
STANDING ORDER M10-468: To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a partys obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information.Parties may consent to electronic service to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for permission to file documents electronically. Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the courts electronic docket. A notice directing the parties attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the courts records. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (rdz) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 3:49 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ira Mercer..(rdz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Bronx County Family Court, Darcel D. Clark, Susan Schieifer Levy, New York City Police Dept. 47 Precinct, Christopher Sally, Sutton. Document filed by Ira Mercer..(rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 3:48 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |