SIEGEL v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02850 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
|
|
Defendant
EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TRANS UNION, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
BARRY SIEGEL
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/26 10:41 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Notice of Removal,, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Equifax Information Services LLC dated April 26, 2024. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Richman, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 10:39 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Richman, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Mark Richman on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Richman, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 04/16 11:11 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Patrick Floyd. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BARRY SIEGEL; EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC; EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.; TRANS UNION, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/16 11:12 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/16 11:14 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/16 11:15 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 7:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Floyd, Jonathan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/15 7:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152583/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-29222538).Document filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC...(Floyd, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons with Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Summons with Notice on Experian, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proof of Service of Complaint on Trans Union, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Proof of Service of Complaint on Equifax, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Notice of Settlement as to Trans Union, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Equifax Consent to Removal |