Witherspoon v. Weber
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Paula Xinis |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01084 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
corresp
Miscellaneous
Mon 04/29 10:51 AM
Correspondence from Edward Witherspoon re: Indictment for State Court Case(bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/29 9:50 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases DLB-24-692 and PX 24-1084 filed by Edward Witherspoon. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/26 1:07 PM
MOTION for Court Issue Writ of Protective Custody by Edward Witherspoon(bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 04/18 12:07 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases DLB-24-692 and PX 24-1084 by Ronald S. Weber(DiMiceli, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew DiMiceli on behalf of Ronald S. Weber (DiMiceli, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Supplement
Thu 04/18 10:48 AM
Supplement to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Edward Witherspoon(bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 10:56 AM
ORDER directing the respondent to Answer the Petition as directed herein within 40 days; Petitioner may file a reply within 28 days. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/17/2024. (c/m to P and c/em as directed 04/17/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Other Relief
Tue 04/16 3:06 PM
MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Edward Witherspoon(bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Notification Letter
Mon 04/15 12:50 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Edward Witherspoon. (c/m to P 4/15/24 - av4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 04/15 12:42 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edward Witherspoon.(av4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |