Extradition of Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota
Maryland District Court | |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00160 |
Cause | 00:0000 |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
114
pgs
misc
Supplement
Wed 04/24 1:21 PM
Supplement to1 Complaint filed by In the Matter of the Extradition of Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1B Pt 2, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1C Pt1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1C Pt2 | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
32
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/22 8:05 PM
NOTICE by In the Matter of the Extradition of Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota (Notice of Filing Memorandum of Law in Support of Extradition Request)(Medinger, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 58 pgs Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 23 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15 PAPERLESS ORDER scheduling an extradition hearing for 1:00 p.m. on Thursday, May 9, 2024 in Courtroom 7D. The United States shall file its hearing brief by April 22, 2024, and any response by Ms. Cholota shall be filed by April 29, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 4/19/2024. (rs2s, Chambers) | |
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/19 3:33 PM
ORDER OF DETENTION BY AGREEMENT as to Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 4/19/2024. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Miscellaneous Hearing
Fri 04/19 3:29 PM
Extradition Hearing & Detention Hearing NOT HELD 4/19/2024 before Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan.(FTR Telita Davis; Courtroom 7B.) (td4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R Szekely on behalf of In the Matter of the Extradition of Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota (Szekely, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/16 5:25 PM
NOTICE by In the Matter of the Extradition of Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota (Notice of Filing Memorandum of Law In Advance Of Detention Hearing)(Medinger, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/16 2:40 PM
ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota. Extradition/Detention Hearing set for 4/19/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 4/15/2024. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Attorney Appointed
Tue 04/16 11:53 AM
ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER - Attorney Appointed: Andrew R Szekely in the Matter of the Extradition of Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 4/15/2024. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
Mon 04/15 5:11 PM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota,(td4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
7 | 7
minutes
Miscellaneous Hearing
Mon 04/15 5:02 PM
Initial Appearance as to Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota (Defendant advised of rights) held on 4/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan.(FTR Telita Davis; Courtroom 7B.) (td4s, Deputy Clerk) (td4s, Deputy Clerk). |
|
Att: 1 (4/19/2024) Attachment : Amended Minute Entry | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Unseal Case
Mon 04/15 11:38 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Unseal Case as to Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 4/15/2024. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Unseal Case
Mon 04/15 11:36 AM
MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota(td4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 WARRANT of Arrest issued (c/s:AUSA/USMS) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) | |
3 | 3 ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 4/12/2024. (cc/s:AUSA/USMS) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) | |
2 | 2 MOTION to Seal by In the Matter of the Extradition of Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT by In the Matter of the Extradition of Nomalanga Moroadi Selina Cholota. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1A |