Doe v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01780 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
RRF Holding Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
RRI West Management, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Red Roof Franchising, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Red Roof Inns, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Varahi Hotel, LLC d/b/a Red Roof Inn
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Related Case Memorandum
Tue 04/30 11:28 AM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Chief Judge has determined that this case and case number 2:24-cv-1780 and 2:19-cv-755 ARE related. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers and Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on April 30, 2024. (jlk) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Rose Grace for Defendants RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc. (Grace, Emily) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Catherine Arko for Defendants RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc. (Arko, Elisabeth) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea R. Mikula for Defendants RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc. (Mikula, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/23 1:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to RRF Holding Company, LLC on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; RRI West Management, LLC on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; Red Roof Franchising, LLC on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; Red Roof Inns, Inc. on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Coffman, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 12:56 PM
Summons Issued as to RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., Varahi Hotel, LLC. (mve) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerks Notice to Pro Hac Vice Attorney
Tue 04/16 12:48 PM
Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Annie McAdams, David E. Harris, Morgan A. Malouf, Preston Burns. (mve) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 6:08 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Jane Doe re1 Complaint List of Related Cases (Coffman, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
48
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9920642), filed by Jane Doe. (Coffman, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form |