Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-00455
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Maria Vedia, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Material Witness
Jonathan Isra Zuniga Arellano
Represented By
Eduardo Romero
Eduardo Romero, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 2:28 AM CDT
Saturday, April 13, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Jose Maria Vedia, Jr (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 4/15/2024 at 09:33 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (av5)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Jose Maria Vedia, Jr, filed. (av5)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Jonathan Isra Zuniga Arellano as to Jose Maria Vedia, Jr. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 4/15/2024 at 09:33 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos, filed. (av5)
Related: [-]
4 4 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on April 13, 2024 at 02:08 PM as to Jose Maria Vedia, Jr. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (av5)
Related: [-]