Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 3:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Chirag Tomar (1)
Represented By
Russ Ferguson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Erin Kimberly Taylor
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew Thomas Warren
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/18/2024 12:19 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
Arrest of Chirag Tomar in Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta). (tlj) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Chirag Tomar. (smm) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Case as to Chirag Tomar (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/20/2023. (smm) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to Chirag Tomar (1). (smm) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
4 4 Arrest Warrant Issued (Sealed - Case Participants) by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf in case as to Chirag Tomar. (smm) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Warrant Page Identifier
5 5 1 pgs MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Chirag Tomar. (brl) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
6 6 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Unseal Case as to Chirag Tomar (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/21/2023. (slm) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
7 7 1 pgs Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Chirag Tomar(tlj) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order of Detention Pending Trial,
Att: 2 Minutes,
Att: 3 3 pgs Docket Sheet
Friday, January 05, 2024
Set Hearings as to Chirag Tomar: Initial Appearance set for 1/10/2024 10:50 AM in Courtroom #1B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. (brl) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Russ Ferguson appearing for Chirag Tomar (Ferguson, Russ) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Defendant's Speedy Trial and Indictment Waiver by USA as to Chirag Tomar(Warren, Matthew) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant's Waiver
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
10 10 PRETRIAL REPORT (SEALED - Attorney) as to Chirag Tomar (available to USA, Chirag Tomar) (Amanda Martin - sb) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
Minute Entry: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Chirag Tomar held before US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Defendant advised of rights & charges. Defendant retained counsel. Identity, preliminary and detention hearing held in the Northern District of Georgia. Defendant remains detained. Government attorney: Matthew Warren. Defendant attorney: Russ Ferguson. Court Reporter: Digital Court Recorder. (brl) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
11 11 Joint MOTION to Enlarge Charging Period Under Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Chirag Tomar. Responses due by 1/17/2024 (Warren, Matthew) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Indictment Waiver
12 12 ORDER as to Chirag Tomar (1) that the 11 Motion to Enlarge Charging Period Under the Speedy Trial Act is GRANTED; and the deadline for the Government to file a bill of indictment or information in this case is EXTENDED to and including until February 20, 2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/10/2024. (kby) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act as to Chirag Tomar. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 1/10/2024. (brl) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
Case as to Chirag Tomar reassigned to Senior Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. (for review of Magistrate Judge Detention Order). US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez reassigned and US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to the case (per division assignment). This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (kby) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
15 15 OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO REVOKE DETENTION ORDER by Chirag Tomar (Ferguson, Russ) Modified text and event on 1/16/2024 (ef). Modified motion relief on 1/17/2024 (kby). [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
16 16 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Chirag Tomar re15 MOTION to Review Magistrate Judge Order (Warren, Matthew) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 21, 2024
17 17 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Chirag Tomar re15 MOTION to Review Magistrate Judge Order (Ferguson, Russ) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
20 20 Joint MOTION to Enlarge Charging Period Under Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Chirag Tomar. Responses due by 2/14/2024 (Warren, Matthew) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment A - Indictment Waiver
Thursday, February 08, 2024
21 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Enlarge Charging Period Under Speedy Trial Act as to Chirag Tomar (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 2/8/2024. (brl) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
22 22 4 pgs Order that the Defendant's 15 Objections and Motion to Revoke Detention Order is DENIED. The decision of the Magistrate Judge is Affirmed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/1/2024. (brl) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
Motion Referred as to Chirag Tomar:23 Joint MOTION to Enlarge Charging Period Under Speedy Trial Act (brl) Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
23 23 Joint MOTION to Enlarge Charging Period Under Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Chirag Tomar. Responses due by 3/14/2024 (Warren, Matthew). Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Rodriguez. Modified to add referral on 3/7/2024 (brl). [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Indictment Waiver
Friday, March 08, 2024
24 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Enlarge Charging Period Under Speedy Trial Act as to Chirag Tomar (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 3/8/2024. (brl) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
27 27 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erin Kimberly Taylor appearing for Chirag Tomar (Taylor, Erin) [3:23-mj-00453-RJC-SCR]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
28 28 5 pgs INFORMATION as to Chirag Tomar (1) count(s) 1. (cjs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Penalty Sheet
29 29 PLEA AGREEMENT ( Restricted ) as to Chirag Tomar (cjs)
Related: [-]
30 30 3 pgs Factual Basis as to Chirag Tomar (cjs)
Related: [-]