Padala v. General Motors LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rita F Lin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02197 |
Nature of Suit | 355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alameda County Superior Court, 24CV067344 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 7:10 PM PDT |
Defendant
General Motors LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mohan Reddy Padala
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 05/01 1:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Motors LLC re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,2 Certificate of Interested Entities,9 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,,3 Certificate of Interested Entities,7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 8 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only,,,1 Notice of Removal,, (Park, Steven) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 05/01 10:48 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 05/01 7:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/29 7:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mohan Reddy Padala.. (Marden, Ryan) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 04/30 4:09 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/15 11:00 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by General Motors LLC.. (Park, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/15 10:02 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for General Motors LLC. re1 Notice of Removal,, (Park, Steven) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for General Motors LLC. re1 Notice of Removal,, (Park, Steven) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV067344. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19316254). Filed by General Motors LLC.(Park, Steven) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Eric Mitchell in Support of Notice of Removal of Entire Case, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric Mitchell, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Eric Mitchell, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Eric Mitchell, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
respoth
Answer to Removal Complaint
Mon 04/15 11:20 AM
Answer to Removal Complaint by General Motors LLC. Document 1 pages 1-6 (kmg, COURT STAFF) |