Figueroa et al v. Multi-Color Corportaion et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Donna M Ryu |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02208 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Napa Superior Court, 24CV000347 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 7:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1-50, inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Multi-Color Corportaion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Figueroa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alden Perez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 04/30 10:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/15 11:38 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/15 7:50 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by Multi-Color Corportaion of Related Cases (Chemers, Alexander) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Multi-Color Corportaion re1 Notice of Removal, / and Disclosure Statement (Chemers, Alexander) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Napa Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV000347. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19317427). Filed by Multi-Color Corportaion.(Chemers, Alexander) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Other State Docs Served, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Answer (Conformed), | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Cheryl Legge, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Angel Galvez, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Ariel Kumpinsky with Exhibits, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |