Arakji v. Abbott Laboratories et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02202 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Amazon
|
|
Defendant
Apple Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Intel Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Mazen Arakji
105 N 1st St. #1544
San Jose, CA 95109 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 10:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Abbott Laboratories served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Amazon served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Apple Inc. served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Intel Corporation served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (jml, COURT STAFF) Modified4 on 4/24/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 1:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories, Amazon, Apple Inc., Intel Corporation.(anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 USM285 Abbott Lab, | ||
Att: 2 USM285 Amazon, | ||
Att: 3 USM285 Apple, | ||
Att: 4 USM285 Intel | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 12:00 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/15 11:20 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 11:18 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mazen Arakji. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT (with Jury Demand) against Abbott Laboratories, Amazon, Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. Filed by Mazen Arakji. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2024.(anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |