Jingco v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Anello |
Referred: | Barbara Lynn Major |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00676 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Midland Credit Management, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Margarita Jingco
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 12:23 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axi) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 12:17 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18757782.), filed by Margarita Jingco. The new case number is 3:24-cv-676-MMA-BLM. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Tiller, Ahren)(axi) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |