Clark v. Miller
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Youlee Yim You |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00645 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
oth_doc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 04/29 1:18 PM
Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 106871 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Robert Clark, Prisoner ID: 17836391) (ljp) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service - 2254 State Habeas
Thu 04/25 10:46 AM
Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Jamie Miller. Filed by Jamie Miller. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Robert Clark, Prisoner ID: 17836391) (Aaron, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
5 - Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order 2254 & 2241
Wed 04/24 9:25 AM
Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 22541 on respondent. Answer is due by 6/24/2024. Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No.3 ) is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed on 4/24/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. **33 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Robert Clark, Prisoner ID: 17836391) (ecp) |
|
Att: 1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment form, | ||
Att: 2 Petition | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT
Wed 04/24 9:01 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 . Signed on 4/24/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Robert Clark, Prisoner ID: 17836391) (ecp) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Mon 04/15 4:35 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Robert Clark, Prisoner ID: 17836391) (eo) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 04/15 4:34 PM
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Robert Vincent Clark. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Robert Clark, Prisoner ID: 17836391) (eo) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Mon 04/15 4:33 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Robert Vincent Clark. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Robert Clark, Prisoner ID: 17836391) (eo) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition - Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Mon 04/15 4:31 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) (IFP Submitted) . Filed by Robert Vincent Clark against Jamie Miller. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Robert Clark, Prisoner ID: ) (eo) |