Cruz-Gutierrez v. Marion County Courts
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Mark D Clarke |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00626 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Returned Mail
Wed 05/01 12:17 PM
Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Assignment Notice4 sent to Jose Cruz-Gutierrez on 4/15/2024 returned as undeliverable. (jw) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Mon 04/15 2:20 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/15/2024.) (jw) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 04/15 2:18 PM
Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. Filed by Jose Cruz-Gutierrez. (jw) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Petition - Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Mon 04/15 2:16 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) (IFP Submitted) . Filed by Jose Cruz-Gutierrez against Marion County Courts.. (jw) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Mon 04/15 2:13 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jose Cruz-Gutierrez. (jw) |