ULRICH v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gene Ek Pratter |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01554 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 4:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO HOLDINGS A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO HOLDINGS EQUITY US INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LP
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK RESEARCH CENTER SEATTLE INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO VENTURES US, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
JOEL ULRICH
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 7:57 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO HOLDINGS A/S, NOVO HOLDINGS EQUITY US INC., NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S, NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LP, NOVO NORDISK RESEARCH CENTER SEATTLE INC., NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC., NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC., NOVO VENTURES US, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/17/24 (bw) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
56
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 04/16 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL against NOVO HOLDINGS A/S, NOVO HOLDINGS EQUITY US INC., NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S, NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LP, NOVO NORDISK RESEARCH CENTER SEATTLE INC., NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC., NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC., NOVO VENTURES US, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17402450.), filed by JOEL ULRICH.(BEREZOFSKY, ESTHER) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 04/16 4:25 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge PRATTER) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-1554. (sbt) |