NINGBO DONGCHUAN SWIMMING POOL EQUIPMENT CO., LTD. v. ONDWAY et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Bissoon |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00568 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 4:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
bowanjie
|
|
Defendant
dewfound
|
|
Defendant
digiger
|
|
Defendant
inpool
|
|
Defendant
motobuddy
|
|
Defendant
ondway
|
|
Defendant
poolclean us
|
|
Defendant
usa warehouse
|
|
Plaintiff
swimming pool ningbo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Errata (to be used by filers)
Tue 04/16 4:14 PM
Errata re1 COMPLAINT, Quality Control message - Attorney Signature Deficient,,,,,, Quality Control message - document should have been filed as 2 separate documents,,,,,, Quality Control message - Party name entered incorrectly,,,,, by NINGBO DONGCHUAN SWIMMING POOL EQUIPMENT CO., LTD.. Reason for Correction: civil cover sheet now filed signed. (Ray, Patricia) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/16 4:09 PM
ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/16/2024. (jmm) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Patent/Trademark Documents - Complaint
Tue 04/16 8:18 AM
PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (cww) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheet | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 8:16 AM
Summons Issued as to BOWANJIE, DEWFOND, DIGIGER, INPOOL US STORE, MOTOBUDDY STORE, ONDWAY, POOLCLEAN US STORE, USA WAREHOUSE (cww) |
|
1 | 1
38
pgs
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Tue 04/16 12:21 AM
COMPLAINT against ondway, poolclean us, usa warehouse, bowanjie, inpool, dewfound, digiger, motobuddy (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8217142), filed by swimming pool ningbo. (Ray, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons summons for patent infringement | ||
misc
QC - Attorney Signature Deficient QC - Document should have been filed as 2 separate documents QC - Party Name Entered Incorrectly
Tue 04/16 7:59 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. Additionally, attorney contact information listed on docket and information listed on complaint does not match. Attorney directed to update account through PACER to ensure accurate contact information is on file., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Exhibits are to filed as attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE ERROR: Party name entered incorrectly. DBA and other alias designations are not to be included as part of the party name. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to enter party names correctly in all future filings. Alias information is to be entered using the Alias function on the party name screen. Additionally, attorney did not enter party names as written on the complaint. See the party naming conventions manual on the Court's website at https://www.https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/attorneys (cww) |
||
misc
QC - No signature s/
Tue 04/16 8:03 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT,. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. Civil Cover Sheet unsigned. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. (cww) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/16 8:06 AM
Judge Cathy Bissoon presiding. (cww) |
||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 1:52 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 4/23/2024. (cel) |