Engeper America Corporation v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00710 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit court of Seminole County, 2024-CA-000464 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 11:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ohio Security Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Engeper America Corporation D/B/A Ace Granite
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/22 9:26 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Jones, Paul) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 10:22 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ohio Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Other Affiliate Peerless Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ohio Casualty Corporation, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ohio Security Insurance Company for Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Jones, Paul) Modified docket text on 4/19/2024 (SET) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 04/19 10:12 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ohio Security Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Jones, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/17 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Paul Hudson Jones, II on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Paul Hudson Jones II. (Jones, Paul) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of appearance
Wed 04/17 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Pablo Caceres on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company (Caceres, J.) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 04/16 3:48 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/16/2024. (KM) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 2:38 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-710-PGB-LHP. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court in and for Seminole County, case number 2024-CA-000464 filed in State Court on 3/12/24. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21986285 filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Jones, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 6 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |