Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Case #: 8:24-cv-00907
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Case in other court:U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 8:19-bk-08638-CPM
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:37 AM EDT
Appellant
The Producers, Inc.
Represented By
Angelina E. Lim
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP
contact info
Alberto F. Gomez, Jr.
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP
contact info
Appellee
DNC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Samantha Oppenheim
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Adam M. Gilbert
Underwood Murray PA
contact info
Scott Underwood
Underwood Murray, P.A.
contact info
Appellee
DOM Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Samantha Oppenheim
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Adam M. Gilbert
Underwood Murray PA
contact info
Scott Underwood
Underwood Murray, P.A.
contact info
Appellee
Vernon H. Decossas, III
Represented By
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Samantha Oppenheim
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Adam M. Gilbert
Underwood Murray PA
contact info
Scott Underwood
Underwood Murray, P.A.
contact info
Appellee
Domain Apps, LLC
Represented By
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Samantha Oppenheim
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Adam M. Gilbert
Underwood Murray PA
contact info
Scott Underwood
Underwood Murray, P.A.
contact info
Appellee
Gregory G. Faia
Represented By
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Samantha Oppenheim
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Joseph H. Lang
Carlton Fields, PA
contact info
Adam M. Gilbert
Underwood Murray PA
contact info
Scott Underwood
Underwood Murray, P.A.
contact info
Donald R. Kirk
Carlton Fields, PA
contact info
Luis Orengo, Jr
Carlton Fields
contact info
In Re
The Producers, Inc.
Interested Party
Vivian Solares Cahill
Represented By
Bryan D. Hull
Bush Ross, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Michael Gardner
Interested Party
CPA Larry S. Hyman
Second Successor Personal Representative of the Estate of Ph 106 S. Tampania Ave. Suite 200 106 S. Tampania Ave.
Tampa, FL 33609
Interested Party
Sigmund Solares
Interested Party
The Estate of Sandra F. Gardner
Represented By
Bryan D. Hull
Bush Ross, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, February 28, 2025
34 34 minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Fri 02/28 5:58 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: MISCELLANEOUS HEARING held on 2/28/2025. Court Reporter: Tana Hess (JCG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
33 33 appeal Appellant's reply brief - bankruptcy Mon 02/24 5:45 PM
APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF by The Producers, Inc.. (Lim, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Time Only Thu 02/20 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The oral argument previously scheduled for 2/28/2025 at 3:00 p.m. is rescheduled. New hearing time:Oral argument (in person) set for 2/28/2025 at 4:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
31 31 appeal Appellee's reply brief - bankruptcy Mon 01/27 4:07 PM
APPELLEE'S REPLY BRIEF by DOM Holdings, Inc., Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia, Vernon H. Decossas, III, DNC Holdings, Inc.. (Kirk, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 01/14 1:26 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part Agreed 29 Motion concerning briefing schedule. The Answer briefs are due 1/27/2025. The Reply briefs are due no later than 2/24/2025. Oral argument remains set for 2/28/2025. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/14/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 01/10 1:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellees' Answer Brief and Appellants' Reply Brief by DOM Holdings, Inc., Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia, Vernon H. Decossas, III, DNC Holdings, Inc.. (Kirk, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 3:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Ryan K. French's 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney French may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Appellees, subject to submission of the Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/16/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 2:39 PM
MOTION for Ryan K. French to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22824705 for $150 by DOM Holdings, Inc., Domain Apps, LLC, Vernon H. Decossas, III, DNC Holdings, Inc.. (Kirk, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 12/02 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Hearing (in person): Oral Argument set for 2/28/2025 at 3:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
25 25 appeal Appellant's brief - bankruptcy Fri 11/22 8:19 PM
APPELLANT'S BRIEF by The Producers, Inc.. (Lim, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of appearance Tue 10/29 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Labbee on behalf of Vivian Solares Cahill, The Estate of Sandra F. Gardner (Labbee, Laura)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 10/29 12:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Agreed Motion for Extension of Briefing Deadlines. Appellants' brief is due 11/22/2024; Appellees' brief is due 1/21/2025; and Appellants' reply brief is due 2/20/2025. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/29/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 10/29 11:27 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Deadlines (AGREED) by The Producers, Inc.. (Lim, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of appearance Mon 10/07 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan D. Hull on behalf of Vivian Solares Cahill, The Estate of Sandra F. Gardner (Hull, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 10/04 12:43 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Agreed Motion for Extension of Briefing Deadlines. Appellants' brief is due 11/8/2024; Appellees' brief is due 1/7/2025; and Appellants' reply brief is due 2/6/2025. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/4/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 10/04 12:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Deadlines (AGREED) by The Producers, Inc.. (Lim, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
18 18 appeal Notice of docketing bankruptcy appeal re Rule 8018 Thu 09/12 10:18 AM
NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 4/15/2024. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
16 16 appeal Transmission of Bankruptcy appeal record Wed 09/11 11:57 PM
BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: 13 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, filed by The Producers, Inc..(Miguenes, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3- Order on Appeal,
Att: 2 4- Memorandum Opinion,
Att: 3 5- Order Denying Rehearing,
Att: 4 6- Appellant Designation,
Att: 5 7- Appellee Designation,
Att: 6 7a- Public Docket,
Att: 7 7b Proof of Claim No. 1,
Att: 8 7c Proof of Claim No. 2,
Att: 9 7d Proof of Claim No. 3,
Att: 10 7e Proof of Claim No. 4,
Att: 11 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000107_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Comparison_of_Allegations_in_Verified_Complaint_Filed_by_Vivian,
Att: 12 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000107_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 13 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000109_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Demonstrative_Aid_Filed_by_Jeffrey_W_Warren_on_behalf_of_Defen,
Att: 14 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000109_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 15 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Timeline_of_Events_Leading_to_the_Filing_of_the_Plaintiffs_Ame,
Att: 16 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_2_Exhibit_1,
Att: 17 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_3_Exhibit_2,
Att: 18 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_4_Exhibit_3,
Att: 19 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_5_Exhibit_4,
Att: 20 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_6_Exhibit_5,
Att: 21 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_7_Exhibit_7,
Att: 22 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_8_Exhibit_7,
Att: 23 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_9_Exhibit_8,
Att: 24 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_10_Exhibit_9,
Att: 25 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000110_ParT_11_Exhibit_10,
Att: 26 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000111_Notice_of_Filing_of_Visual_Aid_Filed_by_Donald_R_Kirk_on_behalf_of_Plaintiffs_DN,
Att: 27 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibits_11_-_25_for_Timeline_of_Events_Leading_to_The_Filing_o,
Att: 28 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_2_Exhibit_11,
Att: 29 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_3_Exhibit_12,
Att: 30 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_4_Exhibit_13,
Att: 31 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_5_Exhibit_14,
Att: 32 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_6_Exhibit_15,
Att: 33 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_7_Exhibit_16,
Att: 34 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_8_Exhibit_17,
Att: 35 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_9_Exhibit_18,
Att: 36 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_10_Exhibit_19,
Att: 37 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_11_Exhibit_20,
Att: 38 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_12_Exhibit_21,
Att: 39 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_13_Exhibit_22,
Att: 40 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_14_Exhibit_23,
Att: 41 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_15_Exhibit_24,
Att: 42 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000112_ParT_16_Exhibit_25,
Att: 43 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibits_26-40_for_Timeline_of_Events_Leading_to_the_Filing_of,
Att: 44 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_2_Exhibit_26,
Att: 45 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_3_Exhibit_27,
Att: 46 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_4_Exhibit_28,
Att: 47 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_5_Exhibit_29,
Att: 48 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_6_Exhibit_30,
Att: 49 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_7_Exhibit_31,
Att: 50 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_8_Exhibit_32,
Att: 51 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_9_Exhibit_33,
Att: 52 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_10_Exhibit_34,
Att: 53 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_11_Exhibit_35,
Att: 54 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_12_Exhibit_36,
Att: 55 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_13_Exhibit_37,
Att: 56 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_14_Exhibit_38,
Att: 57 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_15_Exhibit_39,
Att: 58 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000113_ParT_16_Exhibit_40,
Att: 59 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibits_41_-_56_for_Timeline_of_Events_Leading_to_the_Filing_o,
Att: 60 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_2_Exhibit_41,
Att: 61 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_3_Exhibit_42,
Att: 62 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_4_Exhibit_43,
Att: 63 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_5_Exhibit_44,
Att: 64 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_6_Exhibit_45,
Att: 65 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_7_Exhibit_46,
Att: 66 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_8_Exhibit_47,
Att: 67 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_9_Exhibit_48,
Att: 68 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_10_Exhibit_49,
Att: 69 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_11_Exhibit_50,
Att: 70 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_12_Exhibit_51,
Att: 71 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_13_Exhibit_52,
Att: 72 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_14_Exhibit_53,
Att: 73 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_15_Exhibit_54,
Att: 74 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_16_Exhibit_56,
Att: 75 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000114_ParT_17_Exhibit_56,
Att: 76 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibits_57_-_68_for_Timeline_of_Events_Leading_to_the_Filing_o,
Att: 77 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_2_Exhibit_57,
Att: 78 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_3_Exhibit_58,
Att: 79 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_4_Exhibit_59,
Att: 80 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_5_Exhibit_60,
Att: 81 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_6_Exhibit_61,
Att: 82 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_7_Exhibit_62,
Att: 83 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_8_Exhibit_63,
Att: 84 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_9_Exhibit_64,
Att: 85 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_10_Exhibit_65,
Att: 86 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_11_Exhibit_66,
Att: 87 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_12_Exhibit_67,
Att: 88 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000115_ParT_13_Exhibit_68,
Att: 89 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000117_Order_Setting_Final_Pretrial_and_Order_Scheduling_Trial__Trial_date_set_for_82,
Att: 90 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000122_Order_Denying_in_Part_Defendants_Michael_Gardner_and_Sigmund_Solares_Motion_t,
Att: 91 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000127_ParT_1_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_the_Order_Denying_in_Part_Defendants_Michael_Gar,
Att: 92 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000127_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 93 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000127_ParT_3_Exhibit_B,
Att: 94 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000129_Response_to_Plaintiffs_Filings,
Att: 95 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_1_Amended_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibits_11_-_25_for_Timeline_of_Events_Leading_to_The,
Att: 96 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_2_Exhibit_11,
Att: 97 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_3_Exhibit_12,
Att: 98 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_4_Exhibit_Composite_Exhibit_13,
Att: 99 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_5_Exhibit_14,
Att: 100 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_6_Exhibit_15,
Att: 101 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_7_Exhibit_REDACTED_Composite_Exhibit_16,
Att: 102 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_8_Exhibit_17,
Att: 103 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_9_Exhibit_18,
Att: 104 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_10_Exhibit_19,
Att: 105 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_11_Exhibit_20,
Att: 106 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_12_Exhibit_21,
Att: 107 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_13_Exhibit_22,
Att: 108 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_14_Exhibit_23,
Att: 109 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_15_Exhibit_Composite_Exhibit_24,
Att: 110 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000130_ParT_16_Exhibit_Composite_Exhibit_25,
Att: 111 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Correspondence_and_Exhibits_Related_to_Evidence_Contained_in_Pl,
Att: 112 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 113 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_3_Exhibit_B,
Att: 114 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_4_Exhibit_C,
Att: 115 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_5_Exhibit_D,
Att: 116 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_6_Exhibit_E,
Att: 117 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_7_Exhibit_F,
Att: 118 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_8_Exhibit_G,
Att: 119 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_9_Exhibit_H,
Att: 120 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_10_Exhibit_I,
Att: 121 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_11_Exhibit_J,
Att: 122 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_12_Exhibit_K,
Att: 123 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000131_ParT_13_Exhibit_L,
Att: 124 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000136_Response_to_Defendants_Sigmund_Solares_and_Michael_Gardners_Motion_for_Reconsid,
Att: 125 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000137_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_2-28-22_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearing,
Att: 126 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000138_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_4-20-22_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearing,
Att: 127 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000141_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Demonstrative_Aid_for_the_May_17_2022_Hearing_Filed_by_Jeffrey,
Att: 128 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000141_ParT_2_Exhibit_Demonstrative_Aid,
Att: 129 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000143_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_5-17-22_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearing,
Att: 130 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_1_Notice_of_Plaintiffs_More_Definite_Statement_of_Fraud_Perpetrated_By_Sigmund_So,
Att: 131 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_2_Exhibit_A_-_Gardner_Affidavit,
Att: 132 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_3_Exhibit_B_-_Final_Gardner_Complaint,
Att: 133 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_4_Exhibit_C_-_Trustee_Amended_Complaint,
Att: 134 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_5_Exhibit_D_-_Draft_Plan,
Att: 135 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_6_Exhibit_E_-_EDLA_Complaint_without_Exhibits,
Att: 136 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_7_Exhibit_F_-_Solares_Complaint,
Att: 137 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_8_Exhibit_G_-_Silvey_Agreement,
Att: 138 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_9_Exhibit_H_-_Guardian_Agreement,
Att: 139 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000147_ParT_10_Exhibit_I_-_Burns_Agreement,
Att: 140 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000148_Notice_of_Filing_Interlineated_Amended_Complaint_and_More_Definite_Statement_of,
Att: 141 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000149_Order_Granting_in_Part_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_the_Order_Denying_in_Part_D,
Att: 142 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000151_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_11-18-21_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearin,
Att: 143 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_1_Motion_to_Compel_Production_from_Michael_Gardner_of_Improperly_Withheld_Document,
Att: 144 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 145 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_3_Exhibit_B,
Att: 146 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_4_Exhibit_C,
Att: 147 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_5_Exhibit_D,
Att: 148 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_6_Exhibit_E,
Att: 149 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_7_Exhibit_F,
Att: 150 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_8_Exhibit_G,
Att: 151 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_9_Exhibit_H,
Att: 152 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_10_Exhibit_I,
Att: 153 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_11_Exhibit_J,
Att: 154 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_12_Exhibit_K,
Att: 155 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_13_Exhibit_L,
Att: 156 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000154_ParT_14_Exhibit_M,
Att: 157 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_1_Motion_to_Compel_Production_from_Sigmund_Solares_of_Improperly_Withheld_Document,
Att: 158 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 159 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_3_Exhibit_B,
Att: 160 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_4_Exhibit_C,
Att: 161 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_5_Exhibit_D,
Att: 162 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_6_Exhibit_E,
Att: 163 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_7_Exhibit_F,
Att: 164 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_8_Exhibit_G,
Att: 165 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_9_Exhibit_H,
Att: 166 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_10_Exhibit_I,
Att: 167 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_11_Exhibit_J,
Att: 168 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_12_Exhibit_K,
Att: 169 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_13_Exhibit_L,
Att: 170 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_14_Disclosure_of_Compensation_of_Attorney_for_Debtor_M,
Att: 171 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000155_ParT_15_Exhibit_N,
Att: 172 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000157_Motion_to_Bifurcate_Trial_and_to_Stay_Discovery_Filed_by_Jeffrey_W_Warren_on_be,
Att: 173 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000159_Joinder_in_the_Motion_to_Bifurcate_Trial_and_to_Stay_Discovery_filed_by_Defendan,
Att: 174 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000167_Order_Granting_Plaintiffs_Agreed_Motion_to_Continue_Trial_and_Re-Set_Pretrial_D,
Att: 175 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000168_Order_Scheduling_Four_Day_Trial_and_Final_Pretrial_Conference_Hearing_schedule,
Att: 176 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000173_Answer_to_Amended_Complaint_and_More_Definite_Statement_of_Fraud_of_Defendants_V,
Att: 177 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000174_Answer_to_Amended_Complaint_and_Plaintiffs_More_Definite_Statement_of_Fraud_Per,
Att: 178 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000175_Motion_to_File_Paper_Under_Seal,
Att: 179 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000178_Order_Granting_Motion_To_File_Paper_Under_Seal_Pursuant_to_11_USC_Sections_10,
Att: 180 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000180_Notice_of_Filing_Declarations_in_Partial_Response_to_Motion_to_Compel,
Att: 181 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000181_Notice_of_Filing_Declarations_in_Partial_Response_to_Motion_to_Compel,
Att: 182 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000182_Order_Setting_Pretrial_Deadlines_Final_Pretrial_is_scheduled_for_October_31_20,
Att: 183 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000188_Answer_to_Complaint,
Att: 184 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000192_Agreed_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Bifurcate_Trial_and_to_Stay_Discovery,
Att: 185 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000193_Notice_of_Filing_Declaration_in_Partial_Response_to_Motion_to_Compel,
Att: 186 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000199_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_7-15-22_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearing,
Att: 187 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000202_Answer_to_Third_Party_Complaint_and_Affirmative_Defenses,
Att: 188 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000203_Motion_to_Dismiss_Count_VII_of_The_Producers_Incs_Counterclaim_Filed_by_Scott,
Att: 189 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000205_ParT_1_Motion_to_Compel_Production_from_Sigmund_Solares_and_Vivian_Solares_Cahill_of_Im,
Att: 190 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000205_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 191 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000205_ParT_3_Exhibit_B,
Att: 192 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000205_ParT_4_Exhibit_C,
Att: 193 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000205_ParT_5_Exhibit_D,
Att: 194 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000205_ParT_6_Exhibit_E,
Att: 195 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000205_ParT_7_Exhibit_F,
Att: 196 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000205_ParT_8_Exhibit_G,
Att: 197 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000205_ParT_9_Exhibit_H,
Att: 198 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000216_ParT_1_Opposition_Response_to_the_FD_Parties_Motion_to_Compel_Filed_by_Jeffrey_W_Warr,
Att: 199 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000216_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 200 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000216_ParT_3_Exhibit_B,
Att: 201 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000217_Motion_to_Strike_the_FD_Parties_Motion_to_Compel_and_for_Sanctions_Filed_by_Jef,
Att: 202 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000218_Response_to_the_FD_Motion_to_Compel_Filed_by_Glenn_E_Gallagher_on_behalf_of_Defe,
Att: 203 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000221_Motion_to_Allow,
Att: 204 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000222_Response_to_Vivian_Solares_Cahills_Motion_to_Strike_the_FD_Parties_Motion_to_C,
Att: 205 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000223_ParT_1_Response_to,
Att: 206 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000223_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 207 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000226_ParT_1_Response_to_Motion_to_Permit_Transcription_of_Secretly_Recorded_Communications_F,
Att: 208 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000226_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 209 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000227_ParT_1_Response_to_Motion_to_Permit_Transcription_of_Secretly_Recorded_Communications_F,
Att: 210 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000227_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 211 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000228_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Allow_Transcription_of_Secretly_Recorded_Communications,
Att: 212 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000231_Mediators_Report_and_Notice_of_Inability_to_Reach_an_Agreement_in_Mediation_Adv,
Att: 213 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000240_Unopposed_Motion_for_Reconsideration_and_to_Vacate_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Perm,
Att: 214 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000242_Agreed_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Reconsideration_and_To_Vacate_Order_Granting_Mo,
Att: 215 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000251_Witness_List,
Att: 216 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_1_Motion_For_Partial_Summary_Judgment_Contains_negative_notice_Filed_by_William_G,
Att: 217 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_2_Memorandum_in_support_of_MSJ,
Att: 218 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_3_Uncontested_Facts,
Att: 219 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_4_Exhibit_A,
Att: 220 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_5_Exhibit_B,
Att: 221 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_6_Exhibit_C,
Att: 222 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_7_Exhibit_D,
Att: 223 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_8_Exhibit_E,
Att: 224 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_9_Exhibit_F,
Att: 225 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000257_ParT_10_Exhibit_G,
Att: 226 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_1_Amended_Motion_For_Partial_Summary_Judgment,
Att: 227 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_2_Exhibit_Memorandum_in_Support_of_Partial_Summary_Judgment,
Att: 228 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_3_Exhibit_Uncontested_Facts,
Att: 229 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_4_Exhibit_Exhibit_A,
Att: 230 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_5_Exhibit_Exhibit_B,
Att: 231 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_6_Exhibit_Exhibit_C,
Att: 232 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_7_Exhibit_Exhibit_D,
Att: 233 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_8_Exhibit_Exhibit_E,
Att: 234 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_9_Exhibit_Exhibit_F,
Att: 235 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000260_ParT_10_Exhibit_Exhibit_G,
Att: 236 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000262_Joinder_in_the_Defendants_Vivian_Solares_Cahill_and_the_Estate_of_Sandra_F_Gar,
Att: 237 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000264_Notice_of_Filing_Plaintiffs_Deposition_Designations_Filed_by_Donald_R_Kirk_on_b,
Att: 238 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000265_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_William_Glenn_Burns_on_behalf_of_Defendants_Vivian_Solares,
Att: 239 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000266_Notice_of_Filing_Defendants_Deposition_Designations_Filed_by_William_Glenn_Burn,
Att: 240 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000267_Exhibit_List,
Att: 241 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000268_Exhibit_List,
Att: 242 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000269_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_Glenn_E_Gallagher_on_behalf_of_Defendants_Michael_Gardner,
Att: 243 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000270_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_of_Visual_Aid_Presented_at_March_24_2022_Hearing_Filed_by_Dona,
Att: 244 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000270_ParT_2_Exhibit_Visual_Aid_Presented_at_March_24_2022_Hearing,
Att: 245 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000273_Amended_Agreed_Order_Granting_in_Part_Motion_To_Allow,
Att: 246 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000277_Amended_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_William_Glenn_Burns_on_behalf_of_Defendants_Vivian,
Att: 247 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000279_Amended_Exhibit_List,
Att: 248 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000283_Objection_to_Plaintiffs_Witnesses,
Att: 249 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000284_Objection_to_Plaintiffs_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_William_Glenn_Burns_on_behalf_of,
Att: 250 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000285_Notice_of_Filing_Consolidated_Witness_List_Filed_by_William_Glenn_Burns_on_behal,
Att: 251 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000286_Notice_of_Filing_Consolidated_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_William_Glenn_Burns_on_behal,
Att: 252 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000287_Joinder_in_the_Objections_to_Admissibility_of_Plaintiffs_Exhibits_Filed_by_Glen,
Att: 253 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000288_Joinder_in_the_Objections_to_Witnesses_and_Deposition_DesignationsUse_of_Deposi,
Att: 254 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000289_Objection_to_Defendants_Witness_Lists_or_Alternatively_Motion_for_Protective_O,
Att: 255 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000290_Joinder_In_Vivian_Solares_and_the_Estate_of_Sandra_Gardners_Objection_to_Plaint,
Att: 256 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000291_Joinder_in_Vivian_Solares_and_the_Estate_of_Sandra_Gardners_Objection_to_Plaint,
Att: 257 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000292_Objection_to_Exhibit_Lists_Filed_by_Defendants_Filed_by_Scott_A_Underwood_on_beh,
Att: 258 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000293_Joinder_in_Objections_to_Admissibility_of_Plaintiffs_Exhibits_Filed_by_Glenn_E,
Att: 259 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000294_Joinder_in_Objections_to_Plaintiffs_Witnesses_and_Deposition_DesignationsUse_o,
Att: 260 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000297_Supplemental_Exhibit_List,
Att: 261 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000298_Notice_of_Filing_Consolidated_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_Donald_R_Kirk_on_behalf_of_P,
Att: 262 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_1_Response_to_Defendants_Motion_to_Partial_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Scott_A_Under,
Att: 263 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_2_Exhibit_A,
Att: 264 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_3_Exhibit_B,
Att: 265 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_4_Exhibit_B,
Att: 266 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_5_Exhibit_C,
Att: 267 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_6_Exhibit_D,
Att: 268 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_7_Exhibit_E,
Att: 269 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_8_Exhibit_F,
Att: 270 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_9_Exhibit_G,
Att: 271 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_10_Exhibit_H,
Att: 272 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_11_Exhibit_I,
Att: 273 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_12_Exhibit_J,
Att: 274 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_13_Exhibit_K,
Att: 275 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000301_ParT_14_Exhibit_L,
Att: 276 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000302_Objection_to_Admissibility_of_Plaintiffs_Supplemental_Exhibits_Filed_by_William,
Att: 277 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_1_to_42_43_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_of,
Att: 278 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_2_Exhibit_1,
Att: 279 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_3_Exhibit_2,
Att: 280 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_4_Exhibit_3,
Att: 281 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_5_Exhibit_4,
Att: 282 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_6_Exhibit_5,
Att: 283 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_7_Exhibit_6,
Att: 284 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_8_Exhibit_7,
Att: 285 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_9_Exhibit_8,
Att: 286 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_10_Exhibit_9,
Att: 287 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_11_Exhibit_10,
Att: 288 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_12_Exhibit_11,
Att: 289 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_13_Exhibit_12,
Att: 290 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_14_Exhibit_13,
Att: 291 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_15_Exhibit_14,
Att: 292 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_16_Exhibit_15,
Att: 293 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_17_Exhibit_16,
Att: 294 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_18_Exhibit_17,
Att: 295 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_19_Exhibit_18,
Att: 296 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_20_Exhibit_19,
Att: 297 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_21_Exhibit_20,
Att: 298 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_22_Exhibit_21,
Att: 299 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_23_Exhibit_22,
Att: 300 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_24_Exhibit_23,
Att: 301 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_25_Exhibit_24,
Att: 302 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_26_Exhibit_25,
Att: 303 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_27_Exhibit_26,
Att: 304 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_28_Exhibit_27,
Att: 305 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_29_Exhibit_28,
Att: 306 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_30_Exhibit_29,
Att: 307 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_31_Exhibit_30,
Att: 308 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_32_Exhibit_31,
Att: 309 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_33_Exhibit_32,
Att: 310 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_34_Exhibit_33,
Att: 311 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_35_Exhibit_34,
Att: 312 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_36_Exhibit_35,
Att: 313 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_37_Exhibit_36,
Att: 314 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_38_Exhibit_37,
Att: 315 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_39_Exhibit_38,
Att: 316 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_40_Exhibit_39,
Att: 317 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_41_Exhibit_40,
Att: 318 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_42_Exhibit_41,
Att: 319 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000303_ParT_43_Exhibit_42,
Att: 320 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_42_to_60_20_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_o,
Att: 321 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_2_Exhibit_42,
Att: 322 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_3_Exhibit_43,
Att: 323 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_4_Exhibit_44,
Att: 324 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_5_Exhibit_45,
Att: 325 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_6_Exhibit_46,
Att: 326 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_7_Exhibit_47,
Att: 327 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_8_Exhibit_48,
Att: 328 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_9_Exhibit_49,
Att: 329 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_10_Exhibit_50,
Att: 330 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_11_Exhibit_51,
Att: 331 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_12_Exhibit_52,
Att: 332 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_13_Exhibit_53,
Att: 333 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_14_Exhibit_54,
Att: 334 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_15_Exhibit_55,
Att: 335 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_16_Exhibit_56,
Att: 336 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_17_Exhibit_57,
Att: 337 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_18_Exhibit_58,
Att: 338 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_19_Exhibit_59,
Att: 339 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000304_ParT_20_Exhibit_60,
Att: 340 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_61_to_80_21_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_o,
Att: 341 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_2_Exhibit_61,
Att: 342 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_3_Exhibit_62,
Att: 343 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_4_Exhibit_63,
Att: 344 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_5_Exhibit_64,
Att: 345 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_6_Exhibit_65,
Att: 346 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_7_Exhibit_66,
Att: 347 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_8_Exhibit_67,
Att: 348 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_9_Exhibit_68,
Att: 349 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_10_Exhibit_69,
Att: 350 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_11_Exhibit_70,
Att: 351 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_12_Exhibit_71,
Att: 352 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_13_Exhibit_72,
Att: 353 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_14_Exhibit_73,
Att: 354 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_15_Exhibit_74,
Att: 355 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_16_Exhibit_75,
Att: 356 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_17_Exhibit_76,
Att: 357 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_18_Exhibit_77,
Att: 358 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_19_Exhibit_78,
Att: 359 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_20_Exhibit_79,
Att: 360 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000306_ParT_21_Exhibit_80,
Att: 361 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_5_16_17_19_20_21_23_24_31_32_34_36_37,
Att: 362 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_2_Exhibit_5,
Att: 363 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_3_Exhibit_16,
Att: 364 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_4_Exhibit_17,
Att: 365 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_5_Exhibit_19,
Att: 366 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_6_Exhibit_20,
Att: 367 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_7_Exhibit_21,
Att: 368 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_8_Exhibit_23,
Att: 369 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_9_Exhibit_24,
Att: 370 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_10_Exhibit_31,
Att: 371 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_11_Exhibit_32,
Att: 372 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_12_Exhibit_34,
Att: 373 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_13_Exhibit_36,
Att: 374 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_14_Exhibit_37,
Att: 375 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_15_Exhibit_54,
Att: 376 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_16_Exhibit_55,
Att: 377 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_17_Exhibit_59,
Att: 378 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_18_Exhibit_60,
Att: 379 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_19_Exhibit_62,
Att: 380 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_20_Exhibit_63,
Att: 381 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_21_Exhibit_64,
Att: 382 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_22_Exhibit_65,
Att: 383 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_23_Exhibit_68,
Att: 384 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_24_Exhibit_71,
Att: 385 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_25_Exhibit_73,
Att: 386 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_26_Exhibit_74,
Att: 387 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_27_Exhibit_77,
Att: 388 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000307_ParT_28_Exhibit_78,
Att: 389 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000308_ParT_3_Exhibit_86,
Att: 390 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000308_ParT_4_Exhibit_87,
Att: 391 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000308_ParT_5_Exhibit_89,
Att: 392 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000308_ParT_6_Exhibit_91,
Att: 393 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000308_ParT_7_Exhibit_93,
Att: 394 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000308_ParT_8_Exhibit_94,
Att: 395 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000308_ParT_9_Exhibit_98,
Att: 396 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000309_Response_to_and_in_Opposition_of_the_Motion_to_Dismiss_Count_VII_of_The_Producer,
Att: 397 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_81_to_100_21_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf,
Att: 398 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_2_Exhibit_81,
Att: 399 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_3_Exhibit_82,
Att: 400 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_4_Exhibit_83,
Att: 401 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_5_Exhibit_84,
Att: 402 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_6_Exhibit_85,
Att: 403 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_7_Exhibit_86,
Att: 404 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_8_Exhibit_87,
Att: 405 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_9_Exhibit_88,
Att: 406 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_10_Exhibit_89,
Att: 407 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_11_Exhibit_90,
Att: 408 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_12_Exhibit_91,
Att: 409 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_13_Exhibit_92,
Att: 410 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_14_Exhibit_93,
Att: 411 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_15_Exhibit_94,
Att: 412 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_16_Exhibit_95,
Att: 413 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_17_Exhibit_96,
Att: 414 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_18_Exhibit_97,
Att: 415 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_19_Exhibit_98,
Att: 416 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_20_Exhibit_99,
Att: 417 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000310_ParT_21_Exhibit_100,
Att: 418 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000311_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_102_to_102_2_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf,
Att: 419 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000311_ParT_2_Exhibit_102,
Att: 420 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_101_to_120_21_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf,
Att: 421 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_2_Exhibit_101,
Att: 422 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_3_Exhibit_102,
Att: 423 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_4_Exhibit_103,
Att: 424 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_5_Exhibit_104,
Att: 425 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_6_Exhibit_105,
Att: 426 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_7_Exhibit_106,
Att: 427 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_8_Exhibit_107,
Att: 428 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_9_Exhibit_108,
Att: 429 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_10_Exhibit_109,
Att: 430 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_11_Exhibit_110,
Att: 431 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_12_Exhibit_111,
Att: 432 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_13_Exhibit_112,
Att: 433 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_14_Exhibit_113,
Att: 434 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_15_Exhibit_114,
Att: 435 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_16_Exhibit_115,
Att: 436 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_17_Exhibit_116,
Att: 437 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_18_Exhibit_117,
Att: 438 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_19_Exhibit_118,
Att: 439 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_20_Exhibit_119,
Att: 440 8-21-ap-00333_Docket_000312_ParT_21_Exhibit_120
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of appearance Tue 09/10 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Lang on behalf of Gregory G. Faia (Lang, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
13 13 appeal Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal Tue 06/18 12:02 PM
SECOND AMENDED BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by The Producers, Inc. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:19-bk-08638-CPM. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 6/10/2024.(LD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Transmittal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Docket Sheet Part I,
Att: 4 Exhibit Docket Sheet Part II
Monday, May 27, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Mon 05/27 2:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 11 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Counsel, please advise your colleagues we will carry these three cases together, set argument time (if appropriate) together, and permit each other to adopt colleagues' briefs or arguments made in the related files. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/27/2024. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
11 11 motion Consolidate Cases Mon 05/13 1:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases - Three Related Appeal Cases by The Producers, Inc.. (Lim, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
misc Fees Paid - Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/06 2:25 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID Related [+] by attorney Samantha A. Oppenheim, appearing on behalf of DNC Holdings, Inc., DOM Holdings, Inc., Vernon H. Decossas, III, Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia. Related document:6 MOTION for Samantha A. Oppenheim to appear pro hac vice. (AM)
Related: [-] ceipt Number 70367 for $150
misc Fees Paid - Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/06 2:27 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID Related [+] by attorney Michael W. Magner, appearing on behalf of DNC Holdings, Inc., DOM Holdings, Inc., Vernon H. Decossas, III, Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia. Related document:5 MOTION for Michael W. Magner to appear pro hac vice. (AM)
Related: [-] ceipt Number 70368 for $150
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/01 8:41 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Magner may appear pro hac vice as counsel for Appellees Gregory G. Faia, Vernon H. Decossas, III, DNC Holdings, Inc., Domain Apps, LLC, and DOM Holdings, Inc., subject to payment of the $150.00 special admission fee and submission of the Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/1/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/01 8:40 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Oppenheim may appear pro hac vice as counsel for Appellees Gregory G. Faia, Vernon H. Decossas, III, DNC Holdings, Inc., Domain Apps, LLC, and DOM Holdings, Inc., subject to payment of the $150.00 special admission fee and submission of the Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/1/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
8 8 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/30 3:20 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge William F. Jung. New case number: 8:24-cv-907-WFJ. Judge Mary S. Scriven no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case Tue 04/30 9:19 AM
ORDER GRANTING 4 Parties' Joint Motion to Transfer. The case is TRANSFERRED to the Honorable District Judge William F. Jung, with his Honor's consent, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/30/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 11:05 AM
MOTION for Samantha A. Oppenheim to appear pro hac vice by DNC Holdings, Inc., DOM Holdings, Inc., Vernon H. Decossas, III, Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia. (AA) (e-portal)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 10:37 AM
MOTION for Michael W. Magner to appear pro hac vice by DNC Holdings, Inc., DOM Holdings, Inc., Vernon H. Decossas, III, Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia. (AA) (e-portal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
4 4 motion Change Venue / Transfer Case Thu 04/25 4:11 PM
Joint MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case to Honroable William F. Jung by The Producers, Inc.. (Lim, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of appearance Wed 04/24 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Orengo, Jr on behalf of Gregory G. Faia (Orengo, Luis)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of appearance Wed 04/24 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Gregory G. Faia (Kirk, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal Tue 04/16 9:12 AM
BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by DNC Holdings, Inc., DOM Holdings, Inc., Vernon Decossas, Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:19-bk-08638-CPM. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 4/12/2024.(LD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Transmittal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet